Moreno-Gratini v. Sticht
Petitioner: Merlin Moreno-Gratini
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Case Number: 1:2019cv05964
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Referring Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, #7 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, to Attorney General of the State of New York by certified mail to 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, 10005, and on the District Attorney of New York County by certified mail to One Hogan Place, New York, New York 10013 by Certified Mail # 7018 1130 0001 1826 7185; 7018 1130 0001 1826 7185 with Return Receipt Requested. (aea) Modified on 7/17/2019 (aea).
July 15, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order to Merlin Moreno-Gratini 17-R-2355 Wyoming Correctional Facility P.O. Box 501 Attica, NY 14011-0501. (ras)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Hold Petition in Abeyance Pending Outcome of Exhaustion of State Court Remedies. It is hereby ORDERED: 1. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order and of the petition on the Attorney General of the State of New York by certified mail to 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, 10005, and on the District Attorney of New York County by certified mail to One Hogan Place, New York, New York 10013. Respondent is ORDERED to enter a notice of appearance no later than Friday September 13, 2019. 2. The Court GRANTS Petitioner's motion for a stay. Respondent's time to answer is accordingly stayed pending the exhaustion of the state court proceedings. Petitioner is ORDERED to file a letter as soon as his state court remedies have been exhausted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 07/15/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ras) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Motions referred to Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/12/2019) (rjm)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so redesignated. (jc)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from M. Moreno-Gratini dated 6/18/19 re: (APPLICATION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS) - Plaintiff writes that he has attached to this letter the Supplement to his Petition etc.(Supplement not attached at time of filing). Document filed by Merlin Moreno-Gratini.(sc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Hold Petition in Abeyance Pending Outcome of Exhaustion of State Court Remedies. Document filed by Merlin Moreno-Gratini.(rdz)
June 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 405401238478)Document filed by Merlin Moreno-Gratini.(rdz)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed (MEMORANDUM OF PRO SE FEE). (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno-Gratini v. Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thomas Sticht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Merlin Moreno-Gratini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?