Robert Shapiro v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Robert Shaprio and Robert Shapiro
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 1:2019cv05982
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Referring Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 NOTICE OF MAILING: COPY OF THE 8/9/2019 ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS: Robert Shapiro P.O. Box 2841 450 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10163 (bh)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The order dated September 25, 2019, (Dkt. No. 8) was issued in error. The Clerk of Court is directed to strike the order at Docket Number 8. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/9/2019) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jwh)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF MAILING: COPY OF THE COURT'S 6/28/2019 ORDER REMAILED TO PLAINTIFF AT THE FOLLOWING ADDRESS: Robert Shapiro P.O. Box 2841 450 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10163 (bh)
July 1, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Robert Shapiro. (aea)
June 28, 2019 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 8 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #9 Order Striking Document from Record. (jwh)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 7/29/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 7/29/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Supplement IFP)(bl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 26, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
June 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:19-cv-05243. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTH DISTRICT OF NEW YORK by Judge Percy Anderson transferring case to Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 6/26/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (kca) [Transferred from California Central on 6/26/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/26/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Robert Shaprio. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/26/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym and referred to Magistrate Judge Sherri Pym., filed by plaintiff Robert Shaprio. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 6/26/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Shapiro v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shaprio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?