Natale v. The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C
Plaintiff: John Natale
Defendant: The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C and The Clearing House Payments Company LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05991
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action has been assigned to me for all purposes. Counsel are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court, at the time and place listed below. Date and place of conference: Tuesday, September 3 at 2:30 p.m. at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 21A. And as set forth herein. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 8/12/2019) (ama)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Clearing House Payments Company LLC.(Saxe, Ira)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE #14 Answer) - ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by The Clearing House Payments Company LLC. (Saxe, Ira) Modified on 8/13/2019 (db).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. The Clearing House Payments Company LLC answer due 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/15/2019) (ama)
July 15, 2019 ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 from the case record. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to #11 Memo Endorsement. (ama)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #8 Letter filed by John Natale. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 7/15/2019) (ama)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Clearing House Payments Company LLC.(Saxe, Ira)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Ira M. Saxe, Esq. dated 7/11/2019. Document filed by The Clearing House Payments Company LLC.(Saxe, Ira)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Chris Dioguardi dated July 10, 2019 re: John Natale v. The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C., No. 19-CV-05991-NRB. Document filed by John Natale.(Dioguardi, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Milton L. Williams, Jr. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Joseph Dioguardi on behalf of John Natale. (Dioguardi, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Avni Praful Patel on behalf of John Natale. (Patel, Avni)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John Natale. (Williams, Milton)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Williams, Milton)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17147444)Document filed by John Natale.(Williams, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natale v. The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clearing House Payments Company L.L.C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clearing House Payments Company LLC
Represented By: Ira M. Saxe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Natale
Represented By: Christopher Joseph Dioguardi
Represented By: Avni Praful Patel
Represented By: Milton L. Williams, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?