Rosenstein v. Consolidated Edison Inc et al
Plaintiff: Adam Rosenstein
Defendant: Jane Shin, Consolidated Edison Inc, Devi Mohan and Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06011
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #16 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity), Devi Mohan(Individually), Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity), Jane Shin(Individually).(Limmiatis, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Consolidated Edison, Inc. for Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. Document filed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc..(Limmiatis, Paul)
August 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Limmiatis on behalf of Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. (Limmiatis, Paul)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gerald M. Cohen. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity), Devi Mohan(Individually), Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity), Jane Shin(Individually), CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Adam Rosenstein. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Cohen, Gerald)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #14 Letter filed by Adam Rosenstein. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. The time for plaintiff to file an amended complaint herein is extended to 8-9-2019. So Ordered. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/9/2019.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/31/2019) (js)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Gerald M. Cohen dated July 30, 2019 re: Amending Complaint. Document filed by Adam Rosenstein.(Cohen, Gerald)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Paul Limmiatis dated 7/22/2019 re: In accordance with Judge Marrero's Individual Practices Defendants set forth their grounds for a motion to dismiss the Complaint in its entirety, as follows: The Plaintiff Adam Rosenstein was never employed by Consolidated Edison, Inc., which is a holding company that has no employees. Rather, Plaintiff was employed by Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant consolidated Edison Company. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/22/2019) (js)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Limmiatis on behalf of Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity), Devi Mohan(Individually), Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity), Jane Shin(Individually). (Limmiatis, Paul)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Limmiatis on behalf of Consolidated Edison Inc. (Limmiatis, Paul)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Jane Shin(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Shanice R, Agent Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Adam Rosenstein. (Fuchs, Ilyssa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019; Devi Mohan(Individually) served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Shanice R, Agent Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Adam Rosenstein. (Fuchs, Ilyssa)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Consolidated Edison Inc served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Shanice R, Agent Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Adam Rosenstein. (Fuchs, Ilyssa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fuchs, Ilyssa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilyssa S Fuchs on behalf of Adam Rosenstein. (Fuchs, Ilyssa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Consolidated Edison Inc, Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity), Devi Mohan(Individually), Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity), Jane Shin(Individually). (pc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/28/2019) (pc).
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Victor Marrero. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Gerald M. Cohen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple Jurisdictions were selected. Choose one. If Federal Question is selected, do not fill out the citizenship of principal parties. (pc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Gerald M. Cohen on behalf of Adam Rosenstein. New Address: Cohen & Fitch LLP, 225 Broadway, Suite 2700, New York, NY, United States 10007, 2123749115. (Cohen, Gerald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Consolidated Edison, Devi Mohan, Jane Shin, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Adam Rosenstein. (Cohen, Gerald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Cohen, Gerald) Modified on 6/28/2019 (pc).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Consolidated Edison Inc, Devi Mohan(in her Official Capacity), Devi Mohan(Individually), Jane Shin(in her Official Capacity), Jane Shin(Individually). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17153096)Document filed by Adam Rosenstein.(Cohen, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenstein v. Consolidated Edison Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Shin
Represented By: Paul Limmiatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Edison Inc
Represented By: Paul Limmiatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devi Mohan
Represented By: Paul Limmiatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Limmiatis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Rosenstein
Represented By: Gerald M. Cohen
Represented By: Ilyssa S Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?