Teachers College, Columbia University v. Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO
Petitioner: Teachers College, Columbia University
Respondent: Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO
Case Number: 1:2019cv06021
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 5, 2019 is adjourned to September 24, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. The joint status letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's July 22, 2019 order are due no later than September 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/21/2019) (ama)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Christopher J. Moro, Esq. dated August 21, 2019. Document filed by Teachers College, Columbia University.(Moro, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Moro on behalf of Teachers College, Columbia University. (Moro, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tara Linette Eyer Daub on behalf of Teachers College, Columbia University. (Eyer Daub, Tara)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/22/2019) (mro)
July 2, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Judge Jed S. Rakoff is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with exhibits and Civil Cover Sheet served on Teachers College, Columbia University on 6/27/2019 and 6/28/2019. Service was accepted by Tara E. Daub, Esq.. Service was made by E-mail and Mail. Document filed by Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO. (Lossia, Dana)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653254/2019..Document filed by Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - (State Court filed) Verified Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - (State Court filed) Mar 1., 2007 - Feb. 29, 2012 Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - (State Court filed) Apr. 3, 2012 Memorandum of Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - (State Court filed) May 6, 2015 Memorandum of Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - (State Court filed) Opinion & Award, #6 Exhibit 6 - (State Court filed) Aug. 5, 2016 Letter to Arbitrator, #7 Exhibit 7 - (State Court filed) Sept. 10, 2016 Emails between Arbitrator and Counsel, #8 Exhibit 8 - (State Court filed) Memorandum & Order, #9 Exhibit 9 - (State Court filed) Feb. 22, 2019 Letter to Arbitrator, #10 Exhibit 10 - (State Court filed) Clarified Award, #11 Exhibit 11 - (State Court filed) Affirmation in Support of Verified Petition, #12 Exhibit 12 - (State Court filed) Request for Judicial Intervention, #13 Exhibit 13 - (State Court filed) Notice of Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award)(Lossia, Dana)
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dana Elizabeth Lossia to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled and filed as attachments to the notice of removal pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lossia, Dana)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653254/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17155863).Document filed by Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Lossia, Dana) Modified on 6/28/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teachers College, Columbia University v. Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Local 2110, Technical, Office and Professional Union, UAW, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Dana Elizabeth Lossia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Teachers College, Columbia University
Represented By: Tara Linette Eyer Daub
Represented By: Christopher John Moro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?