Donnelly v. American Carbonation Corporation

Plaintiff: Frederick G. Donnelly
Defendant: American Carbonation Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv06030
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE by American Carbonation Corporation, Frederick G. Donnelly. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/6/2019) (kv)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Notice, COnsent and Reference of a civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Document filed by American Carbonation Corporation. (Calder Greene, Desa)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Desa Onika Calder Greene on behalf of American Carbonation Corporation. (Calder Greene, Desa)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 10, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 10, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02121-ER-KHP. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
July 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 19-cv-2121. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-02121 (EG). Document filed by American Carbonation Corporation.(Calder Greene, Desa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calder Greene, Desa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo).
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo).
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 23249/2019..Document filed by American Carbonation Corporation.(Calder Greene, Desa)
July 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Desa Onika Calder Greene to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; if the PDF is being titled "Petition for Removal", parties must be named petitioner(s) and respondent(s), otherwise title the document "Notice of Removal". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/8/2019. (pne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 7/3/2019 (jgo).
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 23249/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17156756).Document filed by American Carbonation Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Calder Greene, Desa) Modified on 7/1/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donnelly v. American Carbonation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Carbonation Corporation
Represented By: Desa Onika Calder Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick G. Donnelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?