Smith-Grey v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Martha M Smith-Grey
Defendant: Redline Towing, Inc. and Justin P. Williams
Case Number: 1:2019cv06031
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 22 1002 586 7 on 7/9/2019. (rro)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Letter filed by Justin P. Williams ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. This case is hereby REMANDED back to State Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/8/2019) (rro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Attorney Diane B Carvell dated July 8, 2019 re: withdraw the Notice of Removal. Document filed by Justin P. Williams.(Carvell, Diane)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of BRONX. Case Number: 27363/2018E..Document filed by Justin P. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "A" - Amended Sumons and Complaint)(Carvell, Diane)
June 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
June 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Diane Beckman Carvell. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Diane Beckman Carvell to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Notice of Removal exhibits must be labeled and filed as attachments. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc" pursurant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evans D. Prieston on behalf of Martha M Smith-Grey. (Prieston, Evans)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Carvell, Diane)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of NY, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27363/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17156830).Document filed by Justin P. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carvell, Diane) Modified on 6/28/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith-Grey v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redline Towing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin P. Williams
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha M Smith-Grey
Represented By: Evans D. Prieston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?