Bromfield-Thompson v. American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson
Defendant: American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC, GCLR and NBME
Case Number: 1:2019cv06078
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson 1405 Kennedy Street, NW Washington, DC 20011, at, on 7/31/2019 Re: #4 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), one or more summonses (only if you have paid the fee in person or if the judge has ordered that a summons be issued to you) - 2 copies of Summons(es) mailed. (nb)
July 31, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC, NBME. (nb)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff, who is proceeding pro se, paid the filing fees to commence this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue summonses as to Defendants American University of Antigua and NBME. Plaintiff is directed to serve the summons and complaint on each Defendant within 90 days of the issuance of the summons. If within those 90 days, Plaintiff has neither served Defendants nor requested an extension of time to do so, the Court may dismiss the claims against Defendants under Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/30/2019) (ne) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PRO SE APPEARANCE by Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson. (sac)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC, NBME. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401238729) Document filed by Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bromfield-Thompson v. American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American University of Antigua/Manipal Education Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCLR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBME
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Ann Bromfield-Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?