Lugo v. The City of New York et al
Plaintiff: Wilson Lugo
Defendant: Police Officer Pedro Gomez, The City of New York, Police Officer Jose Valdez and Police Officer Sasha Brugal
Interested Party: Office of the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv06086
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Giancarlo Nicholas Martinez on behalf of Office of the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York. (Martinez, Giancarlo)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Wilson Lugo DIN No. 19A1669 Clinton Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929, at, on 7/11/2019 Re: #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sasha Brugal, Pedro Gomez, The City of New York, Jose Valdez. (nb)
July 11, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 7/11/2019 Re: Judge Vernon S. Broderick #7 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Sasha Brugal, Pedro Gomez, The City of New York, Jose Valdez.. (nb)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for the City of New York and 42nd Precinct Police Officers Sasha Brugal #265, Jose Valdez #1842, and Pedro Gomez #580 and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/10/2019) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 8, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Wilson Lugo DIN No. 19A1669 Clinton Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929 ; Superintendent Clinton Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929. (aea)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/3/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Wilson Lugo.(sac)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Sasha Brugal, Pedro Gomez, The City of New York, Jose Valdez. Document filed by Wilson Lugo. (sac)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Wilson Lugo.(sac)
June 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lugo v. The City of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Pedro Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jose Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Sasha Brugal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of the Corporation Counsel of the City of New York
Represented By: Giancarlo Nicholas Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?