Ortega Almonte et al v. Hurricane Strauss Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Filimon Gonzalez Vega, Fidel Guzman Vasquez, Angel Ortega Almonte, Lorenzo Galindo, Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez, Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez, Marcelo Ordaz and David Marquez Conde
Defendant: Peter Doe, Alex Doe, Liz Doe, Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc., George Motzkin, Chris Doe, Brett Tracey, Layla Tov Inc., Shawn Doe, Jay Strauss, Hurricane Strauss Inc. and Oliver Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv06104
Filed: June 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 9/4/2019.(ah)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/5/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/16/2019) (mf)
July 18, 2019 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hurricane Strauss Inc., Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc., Layla Tov Inc..(Jacobs, Lee)
July 18, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Nolan Jacobs on behalf of Alex Doe, Chris Doe, Liz Doe, Oliver Doe, Peter Doe, Shawn Doe, Hurricane Strauss Inc., Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc., Layla Tov Inc., George Motzkin, Jay Strauss, Brett Tracey. (Jacobs, Lee)
July 16, 2019 Filing 53 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shawn Doe. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 52 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Doe. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 51 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oliver Doe. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 50 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liz Doe. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 49 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Layla Tov Inc.. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc.. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Strauss. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hurricane Strauss Inc.. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Motzkin. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Doe. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brett Tracey. (pne)
July 16, 2019 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Doe. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 41 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Shawn Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 40 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Peter Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 39 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Oliver Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 38 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Liz Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 37 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Layla Tov INC, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 36 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jay's Nickels and Dimes INC, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 35 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Jay Strauss, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Hurricane Strauss INC, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 33 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to George Motzkin, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 32 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Chris Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Brett Tracey, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Alex Doe, re: #29 Amended Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), David Marquez Conde(individually), David Marquez Conde(and on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 29 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,,, against Alex Doe, Chris Doe, Liz Doe, Oliver Doe, Peter Doe, Shawn Doe, Hurricane Strauss Inc., Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc., Layla Tov Inc., George Motzkin, Jay Strauss, Brett Tracey with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), David Marquez Conde, David Marquez Conde. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,.(Faillace, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Ryan Tucker on behalf of Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Tucker, Clifford)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shawn Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Peter Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oliver Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liz Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Layla Tov Inc.. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc.. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jay Strauss. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hurricane Strauss Inc.. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to George Motzkin. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chris Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brett Tracey. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alex Doe. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 29, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chris Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oliver Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Peter Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shawn Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 7/1/2019 (pne).
June 29, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Alex Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liz Doe, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brett Tracey, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to George Motzkin, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay Strauss, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay's Nickels And Dimes, Inc. (d/b/a Westville West), re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Layla Tov Inc. (d/b/a Westville Hudson), re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hurricane Strauss, Inc. (d/b/a Westville Chelsea), re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually). (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
June 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alex Doe, Chris Doe, Liz Doe, Oliver Doe, Peter Doe, Shawn Doe, Hurricane Strauss Inc., Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc., Layla Tov Inc., George Motzkin, Jay Strauss, Brett Tracey. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17168259)Document filed by Marcelo Ordaz(individually), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(individually), Angel Ortega Almonte(on behalf of others similarly situated), Angel Ortega Almonte(individually), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(individually), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(individually), Lorenzo Galindo(individually), Marcelo Ordaz(on behalf of others similarly situated), Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Fidel Guzman Vasquez(on behalf of others similarly situated), Lorenzo Galindo(on behalf of others similarly situated), Filimon Gonzalez Vega(individually).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega Almonte et al v. Hurricane Strauss Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Filimon Gonzalez Vega
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidel Guzman Vasquez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Ortega Almonte
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Galindo
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Angel Galicia Jimenez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Mendoza Vazquez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcelo Ordaz
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Marquez Conde
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay's Nickles and Dimes, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Motzkin
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Tracey
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layla Tov Inc.
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Strauss
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurricane Strauss Inc.
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Doe
Represented By: Lee Nolan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?