R.K. et al v. NYC Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: R.K.
Defendant: NYC Department of Education, NYC Board of Education and Chancellor Richard Carranza
Case Number: 1:2019cv06119
Filed: June 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. Chancellor Richard Carranza answer due 9/6/2019; NYC Board of Education answer due 9/6/2019; NYC Department of Education answer due 9/6/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/5/2019) (jca)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Pantalony dated July 30, 2019. Document filed by Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education.(Pantalony, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Douglas Pantalony on behalf of Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education. (Pantalony, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/2/2019) (jca)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chancellor Richard Carranza. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Department of Education. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYC Board of Education. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 30, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hyman, Elisa)
June 30, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in His Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by R.K.(on behalf of himself), R.K.(on behalf of his child, Z.K.). (Hyman, Elisa)
June 30, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by R.K.(on behalf of himself), R.K.(on behalf of his child, Z.K.). (Hyman, Elisa)
June 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYC Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by R.K.(on behalf of himself), R.K.(on behalf of his child, Z.K.). (Hyman, Elisa)
June 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chancellor Richard Carranza, NYC Board of Education, NYC Department of Education. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17169209)Document filed by R.K.(on behalf of himself), R.K.(on behalf of his child, Z.K.).(Hyman, Elisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.K. et al v. NYC Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.K.
Represented By: Elisa F. Hyman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Department of Education
Represented By: Michael Douglas Pantalony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYC Board of Education
Represented By: Michael Douglas Pantalony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chancellor Richard Carranza
Represented By: Michael Douglas Pantalony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?