Sell v. Acer Therapeutics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tyler Sell
Defendant: Acer Therapeutics Inc., Harry Palmin and Chris Schelling
Case Number: 1:2019cv06137
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Jordan Eth to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Jordan Eth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17436795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Acer Therapeutics Inc., Harry Palmin, Chris Schelling. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jordan Eth in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Eth, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jamie A. Levitt on behalf of Acer Therapeutics Inc., Harry Palmin, Chris Schelling. (Levitt, Jamie)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Jordan Eth to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17436795. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED among the undersigned parties, subject to the Court's approval, as follows: Defendants shall not be required to answer or otherwise respond to the initial Complaint in this Action. Within fourteen days following entry of an order by the Court pursuant PSLRA appointing a Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel, counsel for Defendants and Lead Counsel shall confer and submit a proposed schedule for the filing of an amended complaint and Defendants' response thereto. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/6/2019) (ne)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jeremy A. Lieberman dated August 2, 2019 re: to request an adjournment sine die of Defendants obligation to respond to the Complaint in the Action. Document filed by Tyler Sell.(Lieberman, Jeremy)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Tyler Sell. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Tyler Sell. (Hood, Joseph)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acer Therapeutics Inc., Harry Palmin, Chris Schelling. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tyler Sell. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Acer Therapeutics Inc., Chris Schelling, and Harry Palmin, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tyler Sell. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acer Therapeutics Inc., Harry Palmin, Chris Schelling. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17172877)Document filed by Tyler Sell.(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sell v. Acer Therapeutics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acer Therapeutics Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Jamie A. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Palmin
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Jamie A. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Schelling
Represented By: Jordan Eth
Represented By: Jamie A. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Sell
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?