Watthanawongwat v. Quintana et al
Plaintiff: Chidensee Watthanawongwat
Defendant: Susan Quintana and Kenneth Cuccinelli
Case Number: 1:2019cv06144
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-cv-04122, filed on 07/16/2019. (sjo)
July 16, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York. (anc)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. ENDORSEMENT: The Court may transfer a case "[f]or the convenience of the parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice." 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court may also transfer a case based on the consent of the parties. 28 U.S.C. 1404(b). Plaintiff, the only party to appear in this case, has consented to transfer to the Eastern District of New York. Accordingly, the Court orders that this case be transferred to the Eastern District. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of New York without delay. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/16/2019) (anc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #5 Order to Show Cause,,. Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. (Gottfried, David)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by July 16, 2019 as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. In that submission, the Court also expects to be informed of Plaintiff's position regarding a potential transfer to the Eastern District of New York as an alternative to dismissal. Plaintiff is directed to serve this order on Defendants and retain proof of service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/8/2019) (jca)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Michael Gottfried. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:552(a); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 08:1447; the County code has been modified to Queens;. (pc)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Michael Gottfried. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottfried, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana.Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat.(Gottfried, David)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Michael Gottfried. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney David Michael Gottfried to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/8/2019. (pc)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019; Susan Quintana served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat. (Gottfried, David)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kenneth Cuccinelli, Susan Quintana (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17174953).Document filed by Chidensee Watthanawongwat.(Gottfried, David) Modified on 7/2/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watthanawongwat v. Quintana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chidensee Watthanawongwat
Represented By: David Michael Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Quintana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?