Degar v. Royal Caribbean International et al
Plaintiff: Marianne C Degar
Defendant: Royal Caribbean International and Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06148
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 1:19-cv-23476, filed on 08/20/2019. (sjo)
August 20, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Florida (mro)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION OF TRANSFER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for all parties to the above entitled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action is hereby transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. sec. 1404(a) to the United States District Court, Southern District of Florida. This stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/20/2019) (mro)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of transfer. Document filed by Marianne C Degar. (Decolator, John)
August 14, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. answer due 8/20/2019; Royal Caribbean International answer due 8/20/2019. (cf)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By August 20, 2019, Defendants shall answer or otherwise to Rule I.C of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice. Defendants' motion was untimely and no further extensions of this deadline shall be granted. The parties are directed to confer on the proper forum. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/14/2019) (cf)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint . Document filed by Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Royal Caribbean International. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clair, William)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William F. Clair, Jr on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., Royal Caribbean International. (Clair, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.. (gp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Royal Caribbean International. (gp)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne C Degar. (Decolator, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Royal Caribbean International, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Marianne C Degar. (Decolator, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Decolator, John)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/2/2019) (mro)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 10:50 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/2/2019) (mro)
July 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John Vincent Decolator. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marianne C Degar. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17176119)Document filed by Marianne C Degar.(Decolator, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Degar v. Royal Caribbean International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean International
Represented By: William F. Clair, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd.
Represented By: William F. Clair, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne C Degar
Represented By: John Vincent Decolator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?