George et al v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Eduardo Leach, Chelsea Maley, Lisa Jame, Josh Folan, April Boddie, Logan Vairo, Jessica Chandra, Christopher George, Basma Attieh, Mickael Louis and Robert Carobene
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv06185
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 33 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Lender, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 32 DECLARATION of David E. Gottlieb in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Robert Carobene, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gottlieb, David)
September 27, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Robert Carobene, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo. (Gottlieb, David)
September 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/27/2019 Replies due by 10/11/2019. (kv)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/19/2019) (kv)
September 18, 2019 Filing 29 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Renan F. Varghese dated September 18, 2019. Document filed by Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Robert Carobene, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo.(Varghese, Renan)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: In light of the pending motion to dismiss in the above-captioned case, see Dkt. No. 26, the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for November 1, 2019, is hereby adjourned pending the resolution of that motion. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/9/2019) (jwh)
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Lender, David)
September 6, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation.(Lender, David)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Defendant's request is hereby GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 25, 2019 is hereby adjourned to November 1, 2019 at 3:00 PM. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's order of August 29, 2019, Dkt. No. 22, shall be due one week in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/5/2019) (kv)
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Request to Adjourn Initial Pretrial Conference) addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David Singh dated September 5, 2019. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation.(Singh, David)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: denying as moot #17 Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiffs' filing of an amended complaint, Dkt. No. 21, Defendant's motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 17, is hereby DENIED as moot, in accordance with Court's order of August 12, 2019, Dkt. No. 19. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October, 25 2019 at 3:30 PM is hereby restored to the calendar. This resolves Dkt. No. 17. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/30/2019) (ama)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2019) (jca)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Starbucks Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mickael Louis, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Logan Vairo, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Chelsea Maley, Christopher George, Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Robert Carobene.(Gottlieb, David)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Renan F. Varghese dated August 16, 2019 re: Plaintiffs Response to August 12 Order. Document filed by Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo.(Varghese, Renan)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. filed by Starbucks Corporation. On August 8, 2019, Defendant Starbucks Corporation filed a motion to dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 3.F of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, on or before August 18, 2019, Plaintiff must notify the Court and its adversary in writing whether (1) it intends to file an amended pleading and when it will do so or (2) it will rely on the pleading being attacked. Plaintiff is on notice that declining to amend its pleadings to timely respond to a fully briefed argument in the Defendant's August 8 motion to dismiss may well constitute a waiver of the Plaintiffs right to use the amendment process to cure any defects that have been made apparent by the Defendant's briefing. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC., 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial ofleave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"). If Plaintiff chooses to amend, Defendant may then (a) file an answer; (b) file a new motion to dismiss; or (c) submit a letter stating that it relies on the initially-filed motion to dismiss. Nothing in this Order alters the time to amend, answer or move provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Local Rules. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for October 25, 2019 is adjourned pending resolution of this motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2019) (kv)
August 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Lender, David)
August 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation.(Lender, David)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
July 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 AMENDED MOTION for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED MOTION for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Bambo Obaro In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Obaro, Bambo)
July 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #13 MOTION for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17319519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit/Declaration is missing per local rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Bambo Obaro in Support re: #13 MOTION for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17319519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Obaro, Bambo) Modified on 7/26/2019 (bcu).
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bambo Obaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17319519. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Obaro, Bambo) Modified on 7/26/2019 (bcu).
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Renan F Varghese on behalf of Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo. (Varghese, Renan)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Evan Gottlieb on behalf of Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo. (Gottlieb, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Holden Wigdor on behalf of Basma Attieh, April Boddie, Jessica Chandra, Josh Folan, Christopher George, Lisa Jame, Eduardo Leach, Mickael Louis, Chelsea Maley, Logan Vairo. (Wigdor, Douglas)
July 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/8/2019 (ama)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. DE # 8 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by PART ONE Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/09/2019) (ama)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from David J. Lender dated July 5, 2019. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation.(Lender, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Ramraj Singh on behalf of Starbucks Corporation. (Singh, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lender on behalf of Starbucks Corporation. (Lender, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-04650 (AJN). Document filed by Starbucks Corporation.(Singh, David)
July 3, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 1:19-cv-04650-AJN. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney David Ramraj Singh, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney David Ramraj Singh to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Update the Nature of Suit to reflect the selection made on CM/ECF. The Related Case Statement must be filed as a spate event. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Ramraj Singh. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Kings. (dnh)
July 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Ramraj Singh. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christopher George; Jessica Chandra ; Lisa Jame ; Chelsea Maley ; April Boddie ; Mickael Louis ; Eduardo Leach ; Josh Folan ; Logan Vairo ; Basma Attieh ; Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (dnh)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Case Cover Sheet with Related Case Statement served on All Plaintiffs upon Wigdor LLP on July 2, 2019. Service was made by Mail (by Overnight Delivery) and email. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company. (Singh, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 653015/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17183226).Document filed by Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service Acknowledgment)(Singh, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company.(Singh, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Singh, David) Modified on 7/3/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George et al v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Leach
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Maley
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jame
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Folan
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Boddie
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Vairo
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Chandra
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher George
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basma Attieh
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mickael Louis
Represented By: Douglas Holden Wigdor
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carobene
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Renan F Varghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation d/b/a Starbucks Coffee Company
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: David Ramraj Singh
Represented By: David Lender
Represented By: Bambo Obaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?