Acosta v. Cueva et al
Plaintiff: Victor Alfonso Raposo Acosta
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental Inc., Edith Huezo Cueva and Ryder Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06245
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Victor Alfonso Raposo Acosta(Kim, Albert)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert K. Kim on behalf of Victor Alfonso Raposo Acosta. (Kim, Albert)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/24/2019) (mml)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/24/2019) (jca)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Edith Huezo Cueva, Ryder Corp.(Zimmerman, Kevin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Edith Huezo Cueva, Ryder Corp..(Zimmerman, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 25899/2019E..Document filed by Ryder Corp., Edith Huezo Cueva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Zimmerman, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Civil Cover Sheet was not signed;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (sj)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin Michael Zimmerman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ryder Corp.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental Inc.. Document filed by Edith Huezo Cueva, Ryder Truck Rental Inc..(Zimmerman, Kevin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Kevin) Modified on 7/8/2019 (sj).
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx County. Case Number: 25899/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17192628).Document filed by Ryder Truck Rental Inc., Edith Huezo Cueva. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Zimmerman, Kevin) Modified on 7/8/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Cueva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Alfonso Raposo Acosta
Represented By: Albert K. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Truck Rental Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Huezo Cueva
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Corp.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?