AETNA Life Insurance Company v. Rosen et al
Plaintiff: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Phyllis Frank and Emily Rosen
Case Number: 1:2019cv06259
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPOSIT FUNDS #6 Motion to Deposit Funds. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Aetna Life Insurance Company shall submit to the Clerk of the Court the sum of One Hundred Fifty Dollars ($150,000.00) plus accumulated interest to the date of issuance of the check for deposit into the Court's registry. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed as soon aspracticable to invest said sum in an interest-bearing account consistent with the mandates of Fed. R. Civ. P. 67 and Local Civil Rule 67.1. The Clerk shall deduct from the income on the investment a fee consistent with that authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States and set by the Director of the Administrative Office. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/29/2019) (cf) Transmission to Finance Unit (Cashiers) for processing.
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Deposit Funds . Document filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Stio with Exhibit (Complaint), #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stio, Angelo)
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Phyllis Frank waiver sent on 7/16/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. Document filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Stio, Angelo)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Emily Rosen waiver sent on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Document filed by Emily Rosen. (Lewis, Cari)
July 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Angelo Anthony Stio, III. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 150,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 150,000. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Angelo Anthony Stio, III. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Phyllis Frank, Emily Rosen, AETNA Life Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for AETNA Life Insurance Company. Document filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company.(Stio, Angelo)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stio, Angelo)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Phyllis Frank, Emily Rosen. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17195800)Document filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Stio, Angelo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AETNA Life Insurance Company v. Rosen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Angelo Anthony Stio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?