Lopez et al v. PAMDH Enterprises Inc.
Plaintiff: jaime Longoria, Brenda Lynn Geiger, ursula yvonne sanchez, Claudia Samperdro, sandra valencia, Cielo Jean Gibson, Arianny Lopez, Eva Pepaj, Irina Voronina, Dessie Mitcheson, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Ursula Mayes, Arianny Celeste, Claudia Sampedro, sara Underwood and Jaime Edmonson Longoria
Defendant: David Casey and PAMDH Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06310
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by David Casey, PAMDH Enterprises Inc..(Kramer, Lisa)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Vincent Golaszewski on behalf of Brenda Lynn Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jaime Edmonson Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Yvonne Sanchez, sara Underwood, Sandra Valencia, Irina Voronina. (Golaszewski, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from supreme court, County of New York. Case Number: 652090/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17228364).Document filed by PAMDH Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit Defendants Answer)(Kramer, Lisa)
July 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Renee Kramer to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Amended Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Brenda Lynn Geiger, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jaime Edmonson Longoria, Arianny Celeste Lopez, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Claudia Sampedro, Ursula Yvonne Sanchez, sara Underwood, Sandra Valencia, Irina Voronina; amending #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by David Casey. Related document: #2 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit summons and complaint, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit Defendants Answer)(Kramer, Lisa) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jgo).
July 10, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners sara Underwood added. Party added pursuant to #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by sara Underwood. Related document: #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Notice of Removal,,.(Kramer, Lisa)
July 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Renee Kramer re: Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; you must add Sara Underwood. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. (sj)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lisa Renee Kramer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 46:30906. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1331. (sj)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lisa Renee Kramer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Arianny Celeste Lopez; Claudia Sampedro; Jaime Edmonson Longoria; Ursula Yvonne Sanchez; Cielo Jean Gibson; PAMDH Enterprises Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted. (sj)
July 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Renee Kramer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachements and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B," etc. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kramer, Lisa)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kramer, Lisa) Modified on 7/10/2019 (sj).
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - EXHIBITS NOT CLEARLY TITLED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 652090/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17210510).Document filed by PAMDH Enterprises Inc., individually and d/b/a "Katra Lounge". (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kramer, Lisa) Modified on 7/10/2019 (sj).
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lisa Renee Kramer to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 7/15/2019. (sj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 652090/2019..Document filed by Dessie Mitcheson, Claudia Samperdro, Eva Pepaj, jaime Longoria, Brenda Lynn Geiger, Irina Voronina, ursula yvonne sanchez, Arianny Lopez, sandra valencia, Cielo Jean Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kramer, Lisa) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. PAMDH Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: jaime Longoria
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lynn Geiger
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ursula yvonne sanchez
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Samperdro
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sandra valencia
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianny Lopez
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianny Celeste Lopez
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arianny Celeste
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Sampedro
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: sara Underwood
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Edmonson Longoria
Represented By: John Vincent Golaszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Casey
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAMDH Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Renee Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?