Chemoil Corp. v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Chemoil Corporation and Chemoil Corp.
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv06314
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 11/8/2019. (kv)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/27/2019) (kv)
August 26, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Talia Kraemer dated 8/26/2019. Document filed by United States of America.(Kraemer, Talia)
August 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of United States of America. (Kraemer, Talia)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #18 Motion for Susan E. Seabrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/14/2019) (rj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Daniel G. Strickland to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 8/14/2019) (rj)
August 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #18 MOTION for Susan E. Seabrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #17 MOTION for Daniel G. Strickland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Susan E. Seabrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chemoil Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Seabrook, Susan)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Daniel G. Strickland to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chemoil Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Strickland, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 MOTION for Amish M. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/26/2019) (jca)
July 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #15 MOTION for Daniel G. Strickland to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #14 MOTION for Susan E. Seabrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Arizona and North Carolina;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
July 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Amish M. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel G. Strickland to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312888. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chemoil Corp..(Strickland, Daniel) Modified on 7/25/2019 (bcu).
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Susan E. Seabrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chemoil Corp..(Seabrook, Susan) Modified on 7/25/2019 (bcu).
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Amish M. Shah to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17312779. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chemoil Corp..(Shah, Amish)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pne)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chemoil Corp.. (Paul, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chemoil Corp.. (Paul, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Chemoil Corp.. (Paul, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17211409.(Paul, Sarah)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summonses are only issued to named parties in the case. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand (none). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000. (sj)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Sarah Elizabeth Paul. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Chemoil Corp.; United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps. (sj)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chemoil Terminals Corporation for Chemoil Corporation. Document filed by Chemoil Corporation.(Paul, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Pelham Barr, Attorney General for the U.S., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chemoil Corporation. (Paul, Sarah) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Charles P. Rettig, Commissioner of IRS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chemoil Corporation. (Paul, Sarah) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Geoffrey S. Berman, U.S. Attorney, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Chemoil Corporation. (Paul, Sarah) Modified on 7/9/2019 (sj).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Paul, Sarah)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00.)Document filed by Chemoil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Form 720, #2 Exhibit B - Form 843, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Disallowance (credit), #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Disallowance (penalty), #5 Exhibit E - Field Group Memorandum)(Paul, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chemoil Corp. v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemoil Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chemoil Corp.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Paul
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Seabrook
Represented By: Amish M Shah
Represented By: Daniel G Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?