Polaris Images Corporation v. Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Polaris Images Corporation
Defendant: Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06325
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 1/6/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019. Deposition due by 11/18/2019. Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Responses due by 12/13/2019 Replies due by 12/23/2019. Oral Argument set for 1/2/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 04:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/5/2019) (jwh)
August 5, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/5/2019, ( Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
July 25, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/25/2019, ( Initial Conference set for 8/5/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Polaris Images Corporation.(Liebowitz, Richard)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent G/O Media Inc. for Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Capaccio on behalf of Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Capaccio, Lauren)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Arato, Cynthia)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/15/2019) (jwh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gizmodo Media Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Polaris Images Corporation. (Liebowitz, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17208040)Document filed by Polaris Images Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polaris Images Corporation v. Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polaris Images Corporation
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Represented By: Lauren Capaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?