Jasmin Larian LLC v. Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Jasmin Larian, LLC
Defendant: Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2019cv06347
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
July 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge George B. Daniels as possibly related to 1:18-cv-02043. (sjo)
July 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
July 9, 2019 Filing 28 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:18-cv-10438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE #13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court GRANTS Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Accordingly, Defendants request to dismiss and/or stay this action is DENIED as MOOT.The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this case to the United States DistrictCourt for the Southern District of New York, Case Number 18-cv-2043-RWS, locatedat 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE #25 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference currently set for April 15, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. and all related dates are VACATED. Upon the Court's decision on the Motion to Dismiss, and if necessary, the Court will set a hearing for the Scheduling Conference. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 24 The hearing on the MOTION TO DISMISS #13 , scheduled for March 11, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Transfer Case #13 //Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. (Bertch, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Transfer Case #13 filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. (Attorney Benjamin Caleb Bertch added to party Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bertch, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 21 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Transfer Case #13 filed by Plaintiff Jasmin Larian LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph A. Lopez, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY John T. Griffin in place and instead of Sean M. Sullivan as counsel of record for Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Sean M. Sullivan as counsel of record filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John T Griffin added to party Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Griffin, John) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 4/15/19 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc..(Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. Related Case(s): Steven Madden, Ltd. v. Jasmin Larian, LLC, No. 18-cv-2043-RWS (S.D.N.Y. 2018) (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc., identifying Jasmin Larian, LLC dba Cult Gaia, Plaintiff; Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc., Defendant; Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Defendant's Insurance Carrier. (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. identifying No Corporate Parent as Corporate Parent. (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay Case, or in the Alternative, Transfer Case filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the First-To-File Rule, or in the Alternative, to Transfer to the Southern District of New York) (Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. answer now due 2/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc..(Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. answer now due 1/30/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc..(Attorney Sean M Sullivan added to party Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Sean) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Jasmin Larian LLC. (Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jasmin Larian LLC. (Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jasmin Larian LLC, (Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jasmin Larian LLC. (Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22909286 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jasmin Larian LLC. (Attorney Joseph A Lopez added to party Jasmin Larian LLC(pty:pla))(Lopez, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 7/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jasmin Larian LLC v. Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmin Larian, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph D'Arezzo, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Caleb Bertch
Represented By: Sean M Sullivan
Represented By: John T Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?