MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. v. Oceanic Container Line, Inc.
Plaintiff: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Defendant: Oceanic Container Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06440
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Oceanic Container Line, Inc. served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service was accepted by Kenny Whitman, President. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Wolfson, Garth)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/15/2019) (jca)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $338,154,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $338,000. (pne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oceanic Container Line, Inc.. (pne)
July 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OCEANIC CONTAINER LINE, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Wolfson, Garth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..(Wolfson, Garth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolfson, Garth)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Oceanic Container Line, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17226433)Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wolfson, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. v. Oceanic Container Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oceanic Container Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?