Lewis v. Hatem et al
Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Defendant: Ashley Mancini, Ury Abraham Leid, Esq., Grace Edward-Simon, Sophia L. Trott, Esq., Norma Edwards, Statewide Abastract Corp, Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq. and Leon Simon
Case Number: 1:2019cv06446
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Albert A. Hatem in Opposition re: #13 MOTION., #14 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Grace Edward-Simon, Norma Edwards, Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq, Leon Simon, Statewide Abastract Corp. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hatem, Albert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT. Document filed by Bernard Lewis. (sbr)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO STRIKE ALBERT HATEM'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SANCTIONS FOR VIOLATION OF SECTION 470 OF NEW YORK JUDICIARY LAW. Document filed by Bernard Lewis. (vn)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION. Document filed by Bernard Lewis. (vn)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Anthony Hatem on behalf of Norma Edwards. (Hatem, Albert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Anthony Hatem on behalf of Statewide Abastract Corp. (Hatem, Albert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Anthony Hatem on behalf of Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq. (Hatem, Albert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Anthony Hatem on behalf of Grace Edward-Simon. (Hatem, Albert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Albert Anthony Hatem on behalf of Leon Simon. (Hatem, Albert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Leon Simon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Hatem Declaration, #3 Notice LocR 12.1, #4 Memorandum of Law, #5 A-----Decision of January 16 2019 & Appellate Division Denial, #6 B-----Decision of March 12 2019, #7 C-----US District Court---Lewis v. NYC Memos--Transcript--Discontinue Order, #8 D-----Decisions--2 from June 14 2019, #9 E----Transcript of July 5th 2019 & Atty Registration Filing, #10 CERT SERVICE)(Hatem, Albert)
July 30, 2019 Mailed a copy of #6 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Bernard Lewis 4818 Wilder Avenue Bronx, NY 10470. (aea)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to pro se Plaintiff Bernard Lewis at the following address: 4818 Wilder Avenue Bronx, New York 10470. The Plaintiff is also directed to serve this order, and a copy of the complaint on the Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 7/29/2019) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 7/30/2019 (ks).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation): All such motions. Referred to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/26/2019) (jwh)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Bernard Lewis. (sbr)
July 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz)
July 11, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grace Edward-Simon, Norma Edwards, Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq, Ury Abraham Leid, Esq, Ashley Mancini, Leon Simon, Statewide Abastract Corp, Sophia L. Trott, Esq. (rdz)
July 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Grace Edward-Simon, Norma Edwards, Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq, Ury Abraham Leid, Esq, Ashley Mancini, Leon Simon, Statewide Abastract Corp, Sophia L. Trott, Esq. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465403017210)Document filed by Bernard Lewis.(rdz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Hatem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ury Abraham Leid, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Edward-Simon
Represented By: Albert Anthony Hatem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophia L. Trott, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Edwards
Represented By: Albert Anthony Hatem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statewide Abastract Corp
Represented By: Albert Anthony Hatem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Anthony Hatem, Esq.
Represented By: Albert Anthony Hatem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Simon
Represented By: Albert Anthony Hatem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?