Arzu v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Martha Young Arzu
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv06451
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oona Marie Peterson on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Peterson, Oona)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall file his or her motion for judgment on the pleadings no later than 30 days after the parties' joint letter is due. The Commissioner shall file her response to the motion for judgment on the pleadings no later than 60 days after plaintiff's motion is due. No later than 21 days after the Commissioner's response is due, plaintiff shall file any reply. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/17/2019) (cf)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/12/2019) (jca)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (pc)
July 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney David Kuznicki. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Martha Young Arzu, Commissioner of Social Security. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Commissioner of Social Security, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Martha Young Arzu. (Kuznicki, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kuznicki, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17229951)Document filed by Martha Young Arzu.(Kuznicki, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arzu v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Oona Marie Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Young Arzu
Represented By: David Kuznicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?