Clarke v. Marketaxess Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jovani Clarke
Defendant: Marketaxess Holdings Inc., 3PL Integration LLC, Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC and Marketaxess Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv06471
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. 3PL Integration LLC served on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. Service was accepted by Ian Nickerson. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Marketaxess Holdings Inc. served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. Service was accepted by Jackie Arcuri. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Marketaxess Corporation served on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. Service was accepted by Jackie Arcuri. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC served on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. Service was accepted by John Doe, authorized agent. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Marketaxess Corporation served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Marketaxess Holdings Inc. served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marketaxess Holdings Inc.. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marketaxess Corporation. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3PL Integration LLC. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Kathleen Elizabeth Beatty. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 3PL Integration LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marketaxess Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marketaxess Holdings Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MIDTOWN TRACKAGE VENTURES LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jovani Clarke. (Beatty, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3PL Integration LLC, Marketaxess Corporation, Marketaxess Holdings Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17232720)Document filed by Jovani Clarke.(Beatty, Kathleen)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Jovani Clarke. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Beatty, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Marketaxess Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketaxess Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3PL Integration LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midtown Trackage Ventures LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketaxess Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovani Clarke
Represented By: Kathleen Elizabeth Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?