InnoBrilliance, LLC v. Ekin LLC
Plaintiff: InnoBrilliance, LLC
Defendant: Ekin LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06473
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/23/2019) (jwh)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ekin LLC. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Isaac Rabicoff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 35:271; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Isaac Rabicoff to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jgo).
July 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17232928. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Isaac Rabicoff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17232928. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl of Rabicoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ekin LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jgo).
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ekin LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17232769)Document filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InnoBrilliance, LLC v. Ekin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekin LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InnoBrilliance, LLC
Represented By: Isaac Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?