Dynamics Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff: DYNAMICS INC.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06479
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #17 Letter filed by Dynamics Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to submit a further status letter by August 21, 2020, advising the Court of the status of the ITC matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/08/2019) (ama)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Robert W. Morris dated 11/08/19 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Dynamics Inc..(Morris, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Case Stayed. (anc)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Stay. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motion for a stay pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a) is GRANTED until the ITC action is terminated or any determination of the ITC becomes final. The parties are directed to submit a status letter to this Court by November 8, 2019, advising the Court of the status of the ITC proceedings. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Docket Number 13. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/4/2019) (anc)
September 3, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of James E. Marina in Support re: #13 MOTION to Stay - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a).. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Marina, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #13 MOTION to Stay - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a). . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc.. (Arovas, Gregory)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay - Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1659(a). Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc..(Arovas, Gregory)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE NOVEMBER 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint,, addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Robert W. Morris dated 08/12/2019. Document filed by Dynamics Inc.. Return Date set for 8/14/2019 at 09:00 AM.(Morris, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Samsung Research America, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service was accepted by Jiancarlos Degracia, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Dynamics Inc.. (Morris, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. Service was accepted by Jiancarlos Degracia, Legal Clerk. Document filed by Dynamics Inc.. (Morris, Robert)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken, Patent Judge. Judge George B. Daniels is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN RE IMPLEMENTATION OF PATENT PILOT PROGRAM IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 21, 2011). It appearing that the Court has elected to participate in the Pilot Project for Patent Cases established pursuant to Pub L. No. 111-349, 124 Stat. 3674. Therefore, effective November 21, 2011, the Court's participation in the Patent Pilot Project will commence and shall include pro se cases. The Pilot program will be subject to the following procedures: When a designated Pilot judge receives a patent case on initial assignment, the case shall be assigned to that judge for all purposes, without further notice to the Assignment Committee and the Case Assignment Unit.... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 03/29/2012) (bcu) Modified on 7/23/2019 (bcu).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc.. (dnh)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Samsung Research America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Dynamics Inc.. (Morris, Robert)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Morris, Robert)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert William Morris to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be filed separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert William Morris. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code b (Both); County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert William Morris. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Dynamics Inc.; Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.; Samsung Electronics America, Inc.; Samsung Research America, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (jgo)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Robert William Morris. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jgo).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by DYNAMICS INC..(Morris, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Text of Proposed Order Summons)(Morris, Robert)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Research America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17234217)Document filed by DYNAMICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 153 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 100 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - 631 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - 545 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - Certificate of Amendment, #6 Exhibit F - Mutual Non-Disclosure Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Del Ray Article, #8 Exhibit H - 153 Claim Chart, #9 Exhibit I - 100 Claim Chart, #10 Exhibit J - 631 Claim Chart, #11 Exhibit K - 545 Claim Chart)(Morris, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dynamics Inc. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Gregory Steven Arovas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Research America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Steven Arovas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Steven Arovas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DYNAMICS INC.
Represented By: Robert William Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?