Alishaev et al v. Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Morris Jeremias, Yuri Alishaev and Abraham Jeremias
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, John Does 1-18, Bank of America Corporation, Edward Bases, John Pacilio and Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06488
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 10/25/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2019) (jca)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Bank of America Corporation. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc..(Hakki, Adam)
July 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 18, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-06002-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Mark D. Smilow dated July 17, 2019 re: Related Case Statement. Document filed by Yuri Alishaev, Abraham Jeremias, Morris Jeremias.(Smilow, Mark)
July 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mark David Smilow to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Write the name of each party you are requesting a summons for on the docket entry. Do not include the John Does 1-18;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
July 15, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 19cv6002. (pc)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation for Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc..(Hakki, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Franklin Schwed on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.. (Schwed, Richard)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Adam S. Hakki dated July 12, 2019 re: Related Case Statement. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc..(Hakki, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.. (Hakki, Adam)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Edward Bases, John Pacilio, and John Does 1 18, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Yuri Alishaev, Abraham Jeremias, Morris Jeremias. (Smilow, Mark) Modified on 7/15/2019 (pc).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-06002. Document filed by Yuri Alishaev, Abraham Jeremias, Morris Jeremias.(Smilow, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Smilow, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America Corporation, Edward Bases, John Does 1-18, Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, John Pacilio. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17235165)Document filed by Morris Jeremias, Abraham Jeremias, Yuri Alishaev.(Smilow, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alishaev et al v. Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-18
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Bases
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pacilio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Jeremias
Represented By: Mark David Smilow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuri Alishaev
Represented By: Mark David Smilow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham Jeremias
Represented By: Mark David Smilow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?