Ponce Rodriguez et al v. 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Arturo Ponce Rodriguez
Defendant: Kwang Ho Choi, 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc., Charlie Choi, Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc., Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC and 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06500
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jian Hang on behalf of 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., Kwang Ho Choi. (Hang, Jian)
August 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Hershan on behalf of Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Hershan, Paul)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that the time for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond with respect to the Complaint in the above matter is hereby extended to 30 days from the date this Stipulation is ordered by the Court. There has been no previous request for an extension of time. Defendants specifically reserve all defenses to the action, except waives as to service of the initial Complaint. So Ordered. Motions terminated: #21 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman. filed by 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., Kwang Ho Choi. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/26/19) (yv)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Document filed by 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., Kwang Ho Choi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STIPULATION)(Maeng, Ken)
August 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ken H Maeng on behalf of 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., Kwang Ho Choi. (Maeng, Ken)
July 29, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Kwang Ho Choi served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Service was accepted by Jacob Smith, Co-Worker. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually); Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually); Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually); Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually); Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc. served on 7/19/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually); Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. The parties are directed to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Fox no later than one week after an answer is filed to schedule a settlement conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/16/2019) (ne)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING EARLY MEDIATION AND THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/23/2019 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/16/2019) (ne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kwang Ho Choi. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc.. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc.. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc.. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kwang Ho Choi (a.k.a. Charlie Choi), re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc., 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc., Kwang Ho Choi, Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc., Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17236729)Document filed by Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(individually), Arturo Ponce Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ponce Rodriguez et al v. 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kwang Ho Choi
Represented By: Ken H Maeng
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 880 Merit Cleaners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Choi
Represented By: Ken H Maeng
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dry Cleaners Holding Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lex 880 Dry Cleaners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 880 Dry Cleaners, Inc.
Represented By: Ken H Maeng
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Ponce Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Paul Hershan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?