Caldwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Boisey Caldwell
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv06534
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Referring Judge: Ona T Wang
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE, served on Attorney General, U.S. Dept. of Justice. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell. (sc)
August 26, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Boisey Caldwell, Commissioner of Social Security. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/23/2019) (rj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from B. Caldwell, dated 8/20/19 re: Plaintiff writes in response to the document dated 8/16/19 from Geoffrey Berman, attorney for the Commissioner of Social Security, concerning consent being taken away from the district judge and having all matters referred to the magistrate judge or plaintiff will be denied an appeal under Rule 72 etc.. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell.(sc)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from AUSA Leslie Ramirez-Fisher dated 8/21/19 re: Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge for All Purposes. Document filed by Commissioner of Social Security.(Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell. (sc)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF SERVICE & SCHEDULING ORDER - ACKNOWLEDGE RECEIPT & RESPONDING AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell. (sc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Ramirez-Fisher, Leslie)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Boisey Caldwell, at 25 Elliot Place Ap.t E7 Bronx, NY 10452, on 7/29/2019 Re: #7 Order of Service - Social Security via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases), in social security cases only, a flyer about pro bono attorneys available through the New York County Lawyers' Association. (bwa)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: By separate Order being entered today, this case is being referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for a report and recommendation on any motion for judgment on the pleadings. To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties must discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If both parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for the defendant must, within two weeks of the date on which Defendant enters an appearance, either mail or email directly a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form, a copy of which is attached to this order. If the Court approves that form, all further proceedings will then be conducted before the assigned Magistrate Judge rather than before me. An information sheet on proceedings before magistrate judges is also attached to this order. Any appeal would be taken directly to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, as it would be if the consent form were not signed and so ordered. If either party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, within two weeks on which Defendant enters an appearance, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/26/2019) (ama)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF SERVICE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall notify the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York of the filing of this pro se case, brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 405(g), for which the filing fee has been waived. In accordance with the Standing Order "Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases," 16-MC-0171 (Apr. 20, 2016): Within 90 days of the date of this order, the Commissioner must serve and file the Electronic Certified Administrative Record (e-CAR), which will constitute the Commissioner's answer, or otherwise move against the complaint. If the Commissioner wishes to file a motion for judgment on the pleadings, the Commissioner must do so within 60 days of the date on which the e-CAR was filed. The motion must contain a full recitation of the relevant facts and a full description of the underlying administrative proceeding. The plaintiff must file an answering brief within 60 days of the filing of the Commissioner's motion. The Commissioner may file a reply within 21 days thereafter. Memoranda in support of or in opposition to any dispositive motion may not exceed 25 pages in length; reply memoranda may not exceed ten pages in length. A party seeking to exceed these page limitations must apply to the Court for leave to do so, with copies to all counsel, no fewer than seven days before the date on which the memorandum is due. SO ORDERED. Electronic Certified Administrative Record due by 10/24/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/26/2019) (jca) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Social Security. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2019) (jca)
July 16, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application, #3 Standing Order re Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings in Social Security Cases, to Boisey Caldwell 25 Elliot Place Ap.t E7 Bronx, NY 10452.. (aea)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/15/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (See 16-MISC-171 Standing Order filed April 28, 2016). ORDERED that in all Social Security cases hereafter filed under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and 42 U.S.C. 1383(c)(3), the defendant shall within 90 days after service file the certified transcript of administrative proceedings, which shall constitute the defendants' answer, or otherwise move against the complaint... that unless otherwise ordered by the judge to whom the case is assigned, in cases where the plaintiff is represented by counsel, the plaintiff shall file a motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the defendant files the certified transcript of the administrative proceedings... that in cases where the plaintiff is appearing pro se, the defendant shall file its motion for judgment on the pleadings within 60 days of the date on which the certified transcript of administrative proceedings have been filed... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/20/2016) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
July 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell.(rdz)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Boisey Caldwell.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldwell v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boisey Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Leslie A. Ramirez-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?