Almonte v. Idlett et al
Plaintiff: Lucia Almonte
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, LLC, Werner Enterprises, Inc. and Rahman Idlett
Case Number: 1:2019cv06594
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: WHEREAS the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 20, 2019 is no longer convenient to the Court's schedule, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference is ADJOURNED to October 18, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. SO ORDERED., ( Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/12/2019) (ama)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Allyson B. Belmont, Esq. dated September 11, 2019 re: Joint Letter. Document filed by Rahman Idlett, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Lainer, Allyson)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ameer N. Benno on behalf of Lucia Almonte. (Benno, Ameer)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/25/2019) (cf)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lainer, Allyson)
July 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Allyson Beth Lainer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (jgo)
July 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Allyson Beth Lainer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with Attachments served on Block O'Toole & Murphy, LLP on July 16, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Rahman Idlett, Werner Enterprises, Inc.. (Lainer, Allyson)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Werner Enterprises, Inc. for Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Document filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc..(Lainer, Allyson)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lainer, Allyson) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jgo).
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 23907/2019E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17250092).Document filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc., Rahman Idlett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation of Discontinuance as to Werner Enerprises, LLC, #4 Exhibit D - Response to Demand for Damages)(Lainer, Allyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almonte v. Idlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucia Almonte
Represented By: Ameer N. Benno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werner Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahman Idlett
Represented By: Allyson Beth Lainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?