Pharaoh v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Plaintiff: Peter Pharaoh
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Case Number: 1:2019cv06774
Filed: July 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Metro-North Commuter Railroad served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Service was accepted by Alan Muraidekh, Esq.. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Metro-North Commuter Railroad served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Service was accepted by Alan Muraidekh, Esq.. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh. (Dinhofer, Philip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Metro-North Commuter Railroad.(Muraidekh, Alan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh. (Dinhofer, Philip)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Philip J. Dinhofer dated July 25, 2019 re: Adjourn Conference. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh.(Dinhofer, Philip)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip J. Dinhofer to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the plaintiff's name in the caption on the summons PDF contains a typographical error. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #6 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Philip J. Dinhofer dated July 24, 2019 re: Adjourn Conference. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. The initial conference is adjourned from September 24, 2019 to October 1, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 10/1/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/25/2019) (rjm)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Philip J. Dinhofer dated July 24, 2019 re: Adjourn Conference. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh.(Dinhofer, Philip)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peter Pharaoh. (Dinhofer, Philip) Modified on 7/25/2019 (dnh).
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/23/2019) (rj)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip J. Dinhofer to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong summons form; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form dated 06/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
July 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip J. Dinhofer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
July 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip J. Dinhofer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Peter W. Pharaoh ; Metro-North Commuter Railroad. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party name contained a typographical error. (dnh) Modified on 7/22/2019 (dnh).
July 20, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Metro-North Commuter Railroad, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Peter W. Pharaoh. (Dinhofer, Philip) Modified on 7/22/2019 (dnh).
July 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dinhofer, Philip)
July 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro-North Commuter Railroad. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17282159)Document filed by Peter W. Pharaoh.(Dinhofer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pharaoh v. Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro-North Commuter Railroad
Represented By: Alan Muraidekh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Pharaoh
Represented By: Philip J. Dinhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?