Provident Bank v. Lentnek et al
Plaintiff: Provident Bank
Defendant: Sherrie Lentnek and Arnold L. Lentnek
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Arnold Lentnek
Case Number: 1:2019cv06863
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #9 Motion for Nicholas M. Gaunce to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/5/2019) (ks)
August 2, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Nicholas M. Gaunce to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17361940. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Nicholas M. Gaunce to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17361940. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Provident Bank. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Gaunce, Nicholas)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/25/2019) (jca)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sherrie Lentnek. (sj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Arnold L. Lentnek. (sj)
July 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
July 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
July 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Patrick Avolio. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $379,130,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $379,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
July 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Patrick Avolio. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Arnold L. Lentnek; Sherrie Lentnek. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly. (sj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sherrie Lentnek, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Provident Bank. (Avolio, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Arnold L. Lentnek, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Provident Bank. (Avolio, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Provident Financial Services, Inc. for Provident Bank. Document filed by Provident Bank.(Avolio, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Avolio, Robert)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arnold Lentnek, Sherrie Lentnek. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17299324)Document filed by Provident Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Allonge, #3 Exhibit C - Pre-Sale Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Post-Sale Notice)(Avolio, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provident Bank v. Lentnek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Bank
Represented By: Robert Patrick Avolio
Represented By: Nicholas Gaunce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Arnold Lentnek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie Lentnek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold L. Lentnek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?