Zurich American Insurance Company v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06885
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #15 Letter filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Application granted. The initial conference in this case, scheduled for October 11, 2019, is hereby adjourned pending the Court's resolution of Defendant's motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 10/10/2019) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2019) (mt)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company Ltd., a Swiss corporation for Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kolaga, John)
September 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney John T. Kolaga to RE-FILE Document #14 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from John T. Kolaga, Esq. dated September 19, 2019 re: Request an extension of time to respond to motion to dismiss. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kolaga, John)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd for Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Kolaga, John) Modified on 9/20/2019 (ldi).
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Stoia, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Stoia, Charles)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd, Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd, Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Stoia, Charles)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/27/2019) Indian Harbor Insurance Company answer due 9/12/2019 (ks)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Charles J. Stoia, Esq. dated August 26, 2019. Document filed by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Stoia, Charles)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ahmed Joseph Kassim on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Kassim, Ahmed)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Stoia on behalf of Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Stoia, Charles)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Indian Harbor Insurance Company served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. Service was accepted by Steven P. Agosta, Sr. VP. General Counsel. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kolaga, John)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 7/29/2019) (mro)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (dnh)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Indian Harbor Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Kolaga, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kolaga, John)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John T. Kolaga to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request must be filed separately;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney John T. Kolaga. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand none; County code Erie;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to $760000; the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney John T. Kolaga. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17305360)Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C to Complaint, #4 Summons - Indian Harbor Insurance, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kolaga, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: John T. Kolaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Stoia
Represented By: Ahmed Joseph Kassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?