Poleo-Isava v. Helmwell Limited et al
Plaintiff: Rafael David Poleo-Isava
Defendant: Helmwell Limited, A Bristish Virgin Islands Corporation, Jorge Casado-Salicetti and Helmwell Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv06889
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332fc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava.(Yuniver, Steven)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Helmwell Limited.(Kaye, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #15 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by Helmwell Limited. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to September 27, 2019. SO ORDERED., Jorge Casado-Salicetti answer due 9/27/2019; Helmwell Limited answer due 9/27/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 8/29/2019) (ama)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Helmwell Limited. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kaye, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Paul Kaye on behalf of Helmwell Limited. (Kaye, Richard)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Paul Kaye on behalf of Helmwell Limited. (Kaye, Richard)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Helmwell Limited served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service was accepted by SUZ ZOUKY BUSINESS DOCUMENT SPECIALIST. Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Yuniver, Steven)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Helmwell Limited. (dnh)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jorge Casado-Salicetti. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Refunded: for [4 Complaint. Filing fee refunded for Receipt number ANYSDC-17313978, for the following reason(s): duplicate payment. (jom)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HELMWELL LIMITED, A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Yuniver, Steven)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JORGE CASADO SALICETTI, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Yuniver, Steven)
August 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Ross Yuniver to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'As to' Error; the summons request docket entry must list the parties as to whom the summons is being issued. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #4 Complaint,. Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Yuniver, Steven) Modified on 8/2/2019 (dnh).
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yuniver, Steven)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: September 23, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: September 30, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 7/31/2019) (ama)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven Ross Yuniver. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $1,105,328,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Ross Yuniver re: Document No. #4 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; John Doe "1" through "10" (with party text) must be added to the case. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Steven Ross Yuniver to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): no Basis of Jurisdiction selected; caption error; if all names do not fit in the space provided, use "et al" after the name of the first listed plaintiff and defendant. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Steven Ross Yuniver to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; if all names do not fit in the space provided, use "et al" after the name of the first listed plaintiff and defendant; name of the party/parties the summons is being requested for must be entered in the docket entry text; summons not linked to a pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
July 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Rafael David Poleo-Isava, Jorge Casado-Salicetti. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17313978)Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Schedule A, #2 Exhibit B Deed, #3 Exhibit C Mortgage, #4 Exhibit D Promissory Note, #5 Exhibit E Continuing Guaranty., #6 Exhibit F 90-Day Default Notice, #7 Exhibit G Appointment of Alternative Shareholder)(Yuniver, Steven)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Steven Ross Yuniver to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/30/2019. (pne)
July 25, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for 1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17306280, paid on 7/24/2019. (pne)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To ERROR - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RAFAEL DAVID POLEO ISAVA, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Rafael David Poleo-Isava. (Yuniver, Steven) Modified on 7/26/2019 (pne).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Yuniver, Steven) Modified on 7/26/2019 (pne).
July 24, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 1 COMPLAINT - "EASTERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK". The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poleo-Isava v. Helmwell Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael David Poleo-Isava
Represented By: Steven Ross Yuniver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmwell Limited, A Bristish Virgin Islands Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Casado-Salicetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helmwell Limited
Represented By: Richard Paul Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?