Alex and Ani LLC et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: A and A Shareholding Co., LLC and Alex and Ani LLC
Defendant: Does 1-10, and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06929
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1691
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Bank of America, N.A., Does 1-10,. Document filed by Alex and Ani LLC, A and A Shareholding Co., LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Application granted. SO ORDERED. Bank of America, N.A. answer due 9/20/2019. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/16/2019) (rj)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Pamela A. Miller dated August 16, 2019. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Miller, Pamela)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Registered Agent for CT Corporation. Document filed by Alex and Ani LLC; A and A Shareholding Co., LLC. (Hecht, David)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America, N.A.. (jgo)
July 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lawrence Hecht on behalf of A and A Shareholding Co., LLC, Alex and Ani LLC. (Hecht, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, N.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by A and A Shareholding Co., LLC, Alex and Ani LLC. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dhillon, Harmeet)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Does 1-10,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17309159)Document filed by Alex and Ani LLC, A and A Shareholding Co., LLC.(Dhillon, Harmeet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alex and Ani LLC et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A and A Shareholding Co., LLC
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Represented By: David Lawrence Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex and Ani LLC
Represented By: Harmeet Kaur Dhillon
Represented By: David Lawrence Hecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?