Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. v. National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh et al.
Plaintiff: Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh
Case Number: 1:2019cv06957
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Seton Lorenzo on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh. (Lorenzo, Alexander)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2019) (jca)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. U.S. Specialty Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Viducich, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Viducich, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprises L.P. for Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc..(Viducich, Robert)
July 30, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Robert R. Viducich to RE-FILE Document #7 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): wrong case number indicated on document. (ldi)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert R. Viducich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert R. Viducich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert R. Viducich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Icahn Enterprises L.P. for Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc..(Viducich, Robert) Modified on 7/30/2019 (ldi).
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Beigel on behalf of Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Beigel, Herbert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Viducich, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Viducich, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company. Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc..(Viducich, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Viducich, Robert)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17312771)Document filed by Hertz Global Holdings, Inc..(Viducich, Robert) Modified on 7/26/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. v. National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh
Represented By: Alexander Seton Lorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Robert R. Viducich
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?