Delgadillo v. Custom Men LLC
Plaintiff: Desmond Delgadillo
Defendant: Custom Men LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06965
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference [Doc. No. 8] and Individual Rules and Practices of Honorable Alison J. Nathan served on Custom Men LLC on 08/29/2019. Service was accepted by Thane Rosenbaum, Counsel for Defendant. Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo. (Merino, Javier)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/8/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/29/2019) (cf)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Custom Men LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty Authorized Agent. Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service Through the Secretary of State)(Merino, Javier)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Custom Men LLC. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
July 26, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Javier Luis Merino. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 443 (Civil Rights: Accomodations);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 446 (Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other);. (pc)
July 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Javier Luis Merino. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Desmond Delgadillo, Custom Men LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Custom Men LLC, re: #4 Complaint. Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo. (Merino, Javier)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Custom Men LLC. Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo.(Merino, Javier)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Custom Men LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo. (Merino, Javier) Modified on 7/26/2019 (pc).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Merino, Javier)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Desmond Delgadillo. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17313768)Document filed by Desmond Delgadillo.(Merino, Javier) Modified on 7/26/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgadillo v. Custom Men LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Men LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desmond Delgadillo
Represented By: Javier Luis Merino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?