Bellas et al v. Zimmer, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas and Penny Bellas
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc, Zimmer US, Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv07004
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
July 31, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer US, Inc.. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zimmer, Inc. (dnh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penny Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, US, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penny Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penny Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulmer, Brenda)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Brenda S. Fulmer to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; plaintiff name contains a typographical error (Penney). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Brenda S. Fulmer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): caption error; plaintiff name contains a typographical error (Penney). Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
July 29, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brenda S. Fulmer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Penny Bellas. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (pne)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
July 29, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 18MD2859. (pne)
July 29, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda) Modified on 7/29/2019 (pne).
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, US, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda) Modified on 7/29/2019 (pne).
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zimmer, Inc, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas. (Fulmer, Brenda) Modified on 7/29/2019 (pne).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-md-02859. Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas.(Fulmer, Brenda)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fulmer, Brenda) Modified on 7/29/2019 (pne).
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer US, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17321674)Document filed by Lewis Bellas, Penney Bellas.(Fulmer, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellas et al v. Zimmer, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Bellas
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penney Bellas
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Bellas
Represented By: Brenda S. Fulmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?