Liqui-Box, Inc. et al v. DS Smith (UK) Limited et al
Plaintiff: Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc. and Liqui-Box, Inc.
Defendant: David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V., DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith International Limited and DS Smith Holdings Limited
Counter Defendant: Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07069
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Penina Moisa on behalf of Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.. (Moisa, Penina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacob Rae on behalf of Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.. (Rae, Jacob)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Austin Lewis Raynor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Samantha Frances Hynes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (jw)
September 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Austin Lewis Raynor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17567959. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #50 MOTION for Samantha Frances Hynes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17567833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Austin Lewis Raynor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17567959. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DAVID S. SMITH (IRELAND) UNLIMITED COMPANY, DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Raynor, Austin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for Samantha Frances Hynes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17567833. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by DAVID S. SMITH (IRELAND) UNLIMITED COMPANY, DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hynes, Samantha)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Pratik K. Ghosh to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (JW)
September 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #35 MOTION for Pratik K. Ghosh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17533486. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/3/2019) (cf)
September 3, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Pratik K. Ghosh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17533486. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Pratik K. Ghosh in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ghosh, Pratik)
August 31, 2019 Filing 34 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.. (Goldstein, Sandra)
August 30, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern proceedings in this Action, and as further set forth herein. Motions due by 10/16/2019. Responses due by 10/23/2019. Deposition due by 10/11/2019. Discovery due by 9/13/2019. An evidentiary hearing on the parties' motions for injunctive relief will take place on October 29, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007, beginning at 11:00 a.m., and as further specified and set forth in this Order. This document was previously filed in envelope doc. no. 25. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/13/2019) (rjm).
August 30, 2019 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas C. White dated 8/12/2019 re: DS Smith respectfully requests that this Court adopt the attached scheduling proposal. To the extent the Court wishes to discuss this matter, DS Smith is available at the Court's convenience for a conference. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C). This document was previously filed in envelope doc. no. 24. (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 47 ANSWER AND DEFENSES TO COUNTERCLAIMS #45 Counterclaim. COUNTERCLAIM against DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V. Document filed by Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P., Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 23. (rjm) Modified on 9/5/2019 (rjm).
August 30, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stefan Atkinson dated 8/8/2019 re: We represent Plaintiffs (together, "Liqui-Box" or "Plaintiffs") in the above-captioned matter. We write to request that the Court enter the enclosed order for expedited discovery and for an expedited hearing on the injunctive relief Liqui-Box is seeking in this case. (Attachments: #(1) Ex. 1). This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 20. (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 45 ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM to #39 Complaint. COUNTERCLAIM against Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P. Document filed by DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 18. (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 44 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4 (CD format submission). (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4 (CD format submission). (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4 (CD format submission). (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION OF DANIEL CELLUCCI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4. (Attachments: #(1) Ex 1) (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 40 SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION as to DAVID S. SMITH (IRELAND) UNLIMITED COMPANY, DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4. (CD format submission). (rjm).
August 30, 2019 Filing 39 COMPLAINT against DAVID S. SMITH (IRELAND) UNLIMITED COMPANY, DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A). This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4. (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 38 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. This document was previously filed under seal in env. doc. no. 4 (disk format submission). (rjm)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER terminating #32 Motion to Seal Document. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall unseal ECF Nos. 4, 18, 20, and 23-25. Exhibit B to the Complaint (ECF No. 4) shall remain sealed. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 32. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/30/2019) (cf) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 26, 2019 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas C. White dated 08/26/2019. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(White, Thomas)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. The sealing orders at ECF Nos. 3, 8, 21, and 22 are extended to August 30, 2019, subject to further application to the Court. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/26/2019) (cf)
August 23, 2019 Filing 30 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stefan Atkinson dated August 23, 2019. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P..(Atkinson, Stefan)
August 19, 2019 Filing 29 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.. (pc)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. GRANTED. The sealing orders at ECF Nos. 3, 8, 21, and 22 are extended through and including August 23, 2019. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/16/2019) (cf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P., re: Counterclaim. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Sacks, Robert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 26 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time /Extension of Sealing Orders addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stefan Atkinson dated August 16, 2019. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc., Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P..(Atkinson, Stefan)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 14, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 14, 2019 Filing 23 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. Plaintiffs and Additional Counterclaim Defendant may file their answer under seal until August 19, 2019, subject to extension by the Court. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/13/2019) (mro)
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/19/2019 (mro)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. Defendants and Counterclaim Plaintiffs may file their response to Plaintiffs' motion for expedited discovery and an expedited hearing, as well as Defendants' proposed scheduling order, under seal until August 19, 2019, subject to extension by the Court, and file a redacted version of its response and proposed scheduling order three days after resolution of Plaintiffs' sealing application. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/13/2019) (mro) Modified on 8/13/2019 (mro).
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document - Answer and Defenses to Counterclaims addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stefan Atkinson dated August 12, 2019. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc..(Atkinson, Stefan)
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
August 12, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Andrew Sacks to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form; Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P. is not a party listed on CM ECF;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas C. White dated 8/12/2019. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V..(White, Thomas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. Defendants may file their answer and counterclaims under seal for a period of 21 days, subject to extension by the Court, and file a redacted version of the answer and counterclaims three days after resolution of Plaintiffs' sealing application. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/12/2019) (cf) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Olympus Partners, Other Affiliate Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc.,, Other Affiliate LB Holdco, Inc. for Liqui-Box, Inc.; Corporate Parent Olympus Partners, Other Affiliate LB Parent, Inc.,, Other Affiliate LB Holdco, Inc. for Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc..(Goldstein, Sandra)
August 9, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P., re: Counterclaim. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Sacks, Robert) Modified on 8/12/2019 (pc).
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document Answer and Counterclaims addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Thomas C. White dated 8/9/2019. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V..(Sacks, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent DS Smith plc for DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. Document filed by DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V..(White, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Philip Devlin, III on behalf of DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Devlin, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Charles White on behalf of DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (White, Thomas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Andrew Sacks on behalf of DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L., DS Smith (UK) Limited, DS Smith Holdings Limited, DS Smith International Limited, DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V., DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V., David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company, David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (Sacks, Robert)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Seal Document. GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file the August 8, 2019 letter and exhibit under seal, and, consistent with the terms of Judge Swain's order, such filings will remain under seal until August 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/9/2019) (jca) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing. Modified on 8/9/2019 (jca).
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stefan Atkinson dated August 8, 2019. Document filed by Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc., Liqui-Box, Inc..(Atkinson, Stefan)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/7/2019 at 11:20 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/1/2019) (cf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing toconsent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/1/2019) (cf)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE COMPLAINT AND ACCOMPANYING EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL: ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the Complaint in this manner, the Exhibits annexed thereto, and the Exhibit to the Declaration of Daniel Cellucci 2019 under seal is GRANTED, as further set forth in this Orer. (Signed by Part 1 Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/2019) (cf)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL: COMPLAINT/PETITION ONLY AND OTHER DOCUMENTS/EXHIBITS (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/29/2019) (jgo)
July 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L.. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith (UK) Limited. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith International Limited. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V.. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V.. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DS Smith Holdings Limited. (jgo)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liqui-Box, Inc. et al v. DS Smith (UK) Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Smith (Netherlands) B.V.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith (Luxembourg) S.A R.L.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David S. Smith (Ireland) Unlimited Company
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith Packaging Belita B.V.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith Packaging Holding B.V.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith (UK) Limited
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith International Limited
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DS Smith Holdings Limited
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Represented By: Michael Philip Devlin, III
Represented By: Samantha Hynes
Represented By: Thomas Charles White
Represented By: Austin Lewis Raynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liqui-Box Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Penina Moisa
Represented By: Jacob Rae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liqui-Box, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Pratik Ghosh
Represented By: Penina Moisa
Represented By: Jacob Rae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Olympus Growth Fund VI, L.P.
Represented By: Sandra C Goldstein
Represented By: Penina Moisa
Represented By: Jacob Rae
Represented By: Stefan H. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?