Khwaja v. Jobs to Move America et al
Plaintiff: Omer Waqas Khwaja
Defendant: Madeline Janis, Linda Perez-Nguyen, ABC Corps 1-X and Jobs to Move America
Case Number: 1:2019cv07070
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR PRO SE CASE: Deposition due by 6/1/2020. All Discovery due by 6/15/2020. No later than Monday, February 17, 2020, Defendants shall file a joint discovery status letter. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/25/2019) (ama)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: As discussed with the parties, Pro Se Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss shall be served on Defendants and filed with the court no later than Friday, October 11, 2019. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than Friday, October 18, 2019. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail this Order to Pro Se Plaintiff at the address indicated on the docket. SO ORDERED., ( Responses due by 10/11/2019, Replies due by 10/18/2019.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/25/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #31 Letter Motion to Stay. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion to stay discovery is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court shall mail this Order to the Pro Se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/25/2019) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #33 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #32 Order on Motion to Stay, to Omer Waqas Khwaja 150 Hopkins Ave. Apt. 1 Jersey City, NJ 07306. (aea)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/25/2019. (kl)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Stay Discovery addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Julie A. Dabrowski dated September 20, 2019. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen.(Dabrowski, Julie)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Madeline Janis In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Weber, Kimberley)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FIRST PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT (Proposed Case Management Plan for Pro Se Cases). Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen.(Dabrowski, Julie)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #26 Motion for Kimberley C. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/16/2019) (js) Modified on 9/16/2019 (js).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #25 Motion for Sarah O. Varela to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 9/16/2019) (js) Modified on 9/16/2019 (js).
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Kimberley C. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Weber, Kimberley)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Sarah O. Varela to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 propsed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Varela, Sarah)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Sarah O. Varela to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #26 MOTION for Kimberley C. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sarah O. Varela to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17590526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Varela, Sarah) Modified on 9/12/2019 (wb).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Kimberley C. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17590196. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Order For Admission Pro Hac)(Weber, Kimberley) Modified on 9/12/2019 (wb).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #23 MOTION for Kimberley C. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17590196. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #24 MOTION for Sarah O. Varela to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17590526. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick John Walsh on behalf of Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Walsh, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Request GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to send this Order to pro se Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. SO ORDERED. Linda Perez-Nguyen answer due 9/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/30/2019) (kl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Omer Waqas Khwaja 150 Hopkins Ave. Apt. 1 Jersey City, NJ 07306. (aea)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Linda Perez-Nguyen addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Julie Dabrowski dated August 29, 2019. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen.(Dabrowski, Julie)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert B. Stulberg on behalf of Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Stulberg, Robert)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Pro Se Intake Unit from Omer Waqas Khwaja re: Plaintiff respectfully request the Court to order Defendants to compensate him for costs of serving them in California which includes $206.00 plus a day of lost work. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's request for costs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff can renew his motion for costs at the conclusion of this matter, if he is the prevailing party. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to send this Order to Pro Se Plaintiff at the address listed on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/26/2019) (js) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julie Anne Dabrowski on behalf of Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Dabrowski, Julie)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #18 Endorsed Letter, to Omer Waqas Khwaja 150 Hopkins Ave. Apt. 1 Jersey City, NJ 07306 PRO SE. (aea)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Jobs to Move America served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. Service was accepted by Madeline Janis. Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja. (sc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Madeline Janis served on 8/9/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Service was accepted by Madeline Janis. Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja. (sc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER from Omer Khwaja, dated 8/21/19 re: COSTS INCURRED IN SERVING DEFENDANTS - COURT'S GRANT OF EXTENSION TO FILE ANSWER. Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja.(sc)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint, served. Linda Perez-Nguyen served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. Service was accepted by Leslie Nolan, receptionist. Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja. (sc) Modified on 8/22/2019 (sc).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Complaint served. Jobs to Move America served on 8/5/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. Service was accepted by Madeline Janis. Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja. (sc)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Letter Motion; Notice of Appearance served on Omer W. Khwaja on 8/13/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America. (Walsh, Patrick)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Request GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy this Order to pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Madeline Janis answer due 9/20/2019; Jobs to Move America answer due 9/20/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/14/2019) (kl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, to Omer Waqas Khwaja 150 Hopkins Ave. Apt. 1 Jersey City, NJ 07306. (aea)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Patrick J. Walsh dated August 13, 2019. Document filed by Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America.(Walsh, Patrick)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Wednesday, September 25, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. If any party needs to change the date of the conference, that party must make the request, by letter, as soon as the need for a different date is known. Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 8/13/2019) (kl) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick John Walsh on behalf of Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America. (Walsh, Patrick)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #8 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, to Omer Waqas Khwaja 150 Hopkins Ave. Apt. 1 Jersey City, NJ 07306. (aea)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO SE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE: Pro se Plaintiff and counsel for all parties are hereby notified that this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron for the purposes of Case Management and Scheduling pursuant to Federal Rule Civil Procedure 16. You are directed to furnish all attorneys in this action with copies of this order and enclosures. If you are unaware of the identity of counsel for any of the parties, you must send a copy of the notice and rules to that party personally, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/1/2019) (jwh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR PRO SE EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION CASES: IT IS ORDERED that this pro se case is referred for mediation to the Court's Mediation Program. Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Mediation Program Procedures shall govern the mediation. Unless otherwise ordered, the mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling order issued by this Court, and all parties are obligated to continue to litigate the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall attempt to locate pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff at the mediation. Pro bono counsel will contact Plaintiff directly. The time to assign a mediator under Local Civil Rule 83.9 and the Court's Mediation Program Procedures will be deferred until pro bono counsel has filed a Notice of Limited Appearance of Pro Bono Counsel. Pro bono counsel will represent Plaintiff solely for purposes of the mediation, and that representation will terminate at the conclusion of the mediation process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any objection by Plaintiff either to the mediation or to the Court's request for pro bono counsel to represent Plaintiff in the mediation must be filed within 14 days of this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/1/2019) (jwh)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/1/2019) (jwh)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ABC Corps 1-X, Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (Filing Fee $ $400.00, Receipt Number 465401240846)Document filed by Omer Waqas Khwaja.(rdz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABC Corps 1-X, Madeline Janis, Jobs to Move America, Linda Perez-Nguyen. (rdz)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz) Modified on 7/31/2019 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khwaja v. Jobs to Move America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omer Waqas Khwaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline Janis
Represented By: Julie Anne Dabrowski
Represented By: Sarah O. Varela
Represented By: Kimberley C Weber
Represented By: Robert B. Stulberg
Represented By: Patrick John Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Perez-Nguyen
Represented By: Julie Anne Dabrowski
Represented By: Sarah O. Varela
Represented By: Kimberley C Weber
Represented By: Robert B. Stulberg
Represented By: Patrick John Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corps 1-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jobs to Move America
Represented By: Julie Anne Dabrowski
Represented By: Sarah O. Varela
Represented By: Kimberley C Weber
Represented By: Robert B. Stulberg
Represented By: Patrick John Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?