Pina-Mejia v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Nataniel Pina-Mejia
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07094
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Received e-mail from the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:19-cv-04676, filed on 08/14/2019. (sjo)
August 14, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of New York (ama)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 8/07/2019) (ama) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing, by August 6, 2019, why this action should not be transferred. If Plaintiff fails to respond within the time allowed, or fails to show that venue is proper in the Southern District of New York and that the action should not be transferred in the interest of justice, the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/31/2019) (cf)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Marc Twyman Wietzke. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nataniel Pina-Mejia. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Nataniel Pina-Mejia. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). Modified on 7/31/2019 (pne).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17337256)Document filed by Nataniel Pina-Mejia.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pina-Mejia v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nataniel Pina-Mejia
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?