Levin v. Long Island Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth Levin
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv07095
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference is ADJOURNED to October 18, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. (Initial Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/16/2019) (rro)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Marc Wietzke dated September 12, 2019 re: Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan. Document filed by Kenneth Levin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Wietzke, Marc)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The IPTC is ADJOURNED to October 11, 2019, at 10:00 A.M. The parties' joint preconference letter and jointly proposed case management plan are due no later than October 3, 2019. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/30/2019) (ama)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Kevin McCaffrey dated August 30, 2019. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(McCaffrey, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(McCaffrey, Kevin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MTA, Other Affiliate MTA Capital Construction, Other Affiliate MTA Bus Company and MTA Staten Island Railway, Other Affiliate MTA Metro-North Commuter Railroad, Other Affiliate MTA New York City Transit, Other Affiliate MTA Bridges and Tunnels for Long Island Railroad Company. Document filed by Long Island Railroad Company.(McCaffrey, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on September 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse,40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. By the date of the IPTC, counsel for all parties are required to register as filing users in accordance with the Procedures of Electronic Case Filing and file a Notice of Appearance. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/31/2019) (ama)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Long Island Railroad Company. (pne)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wietzke, Marc)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Long Island Railroad Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kenneth Levin. (Wietzke, Marc) Modified on 7/31/2019 (dnh). Modified on 7/31/2019 (pne).
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Long Island Railroad Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17337529)Document filed by Kenneth Levin.(Wietzke, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levin v. Long Island Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Island Railroad Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Levin
Represented By: Marc Twyman Wietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?