Federal Insurance Company v. Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Defendant: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Case Number: 1:2019cv07097
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cody Douglas King on behalf of Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft. (King, Cody)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft.(Fernandez, Michael)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft.(Fernandez, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT: It is hereby Stipulation and Agreed, by and between the undersigned, attorneys for the parties herein that the time in which HAPAG LLOYD AKTIENGESELLSCHAPT may answer, appear or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including September 20, 2019. So ordered. Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft answer due 9/20/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/3/2019) (js)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Casey, Martin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. Service was accepted by Raul Claros. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Casey, Martin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Martin F. Casey dated 08/02/2019 re: Transmittal of Order for Initial Pre-Trial Conference. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit transmittal letter to defendant)(Casey, Martin)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/31/2019) (rro)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
July 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Group of Insurance Companies for Federal Insurance Company. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Casey, Martin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Casey, Martin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft d/b/a Hapag-Lloyd, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Casey, Martin)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17337657)Document filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Casey, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hapag-Lloyd Aktiengesellschaft
Represented By: Cody Douglas King
Represented By: Michael Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?