Ayantunji v. Hanesbrands Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Ayantunji
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. and Hanesbrands Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07145
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. For diversity purposes, "a corporation shall be deemed to be a citizen of every State and foreign state by which it has been incorporated and of the State or foreign state where it has its principal place of business." 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). Thus, in order to invoke this Court's diversity jurisdiction, Defendant Hanesbrands Inc. must allege both where each corporate defendant was incorporated and where it holds its principal place of business. While Hanesbrands Inc. has alleged where both defendants have been incorporated, it has failed to allege in which state each defendant has its principal place of business. Therefore, Defendant shall, on or before August 16, 2019, either (1) show cause as to why its complaint should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or (2) move to file an amended notice of removal that properly pleads jurisdiction. If Defendant fails to do so, this action may be dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 8/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/5/2019) (rjm)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Hanesbrands Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)..(Sclar, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27451/2019E..Document filed by Hanesbrands Inc..(Sclar, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Alan Mark Sclar. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Alan Mark Sclar to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #3 Notice of Removal. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17345919, paid on 7/31/2019. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 27451/2019E..Document filed by Hanesbrands Inc..(Sclar, Alan) Modified on 8/1/2019 (pc).
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by Hanesbrands Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Errata Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer)(Sclar, Alan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sclar, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayantunji v. Hanesbrands Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanesbrands Inc.
Represented By: Alan Mark Sclar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ayantunji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?