Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv07147
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(Q CONFERENCE granting #7 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena: FIND, ORDER AND ADJUDGE: Plaintiff may serve the ISP with a Rule 45 subpoena commanding the ISP to provide Plaintiff with the true name and address of the Defendant to whom the ISP assigned an IP address as set forth on Exhibit A to the Complaint. Plaintiff shall attach to any such subpoena a copy of this Order,as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/8/2019) (jwh)
August 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 8/7/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Cases. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Tobias Fieser in Support re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Patrick Paige in Support re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Colette Pelissier in Support re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference .. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Conway, Kevin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena on Defendant's ISP, prior to a Rule 26(f) conference . Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Kevin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
August 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Kevin T. Conway. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
July 31, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 3 AO 121 Form Copyright. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Conway, Kevin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17346122)Document filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Conway, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Kevin T. Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?