Conner et al v. General Motors LLC et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Conner and Matthew Conner
Defendant: General Motors Company, Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc., General Motors L.L.C. and Continental AG
Case Number: 1:2019cv07190
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332tm
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER: Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1. As this case, Conner v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-7190, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14- MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 8/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-07190-JMF(tro)
August 1, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (tro)
August 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (sjo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Illinois Central; Case Number: 2:19-cv-02181. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL 2543 CTO-131) entered by Clerk, MDL Panel, transferring this case to the Southern District of New York. This case is terminated. (KB, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 MDL No. 2543 Remark : CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-131) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. (2 in ILC/2:19-cv-02181, 1341 in MDL No. 2543) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2543, ILC/2:19-cv-02181 (TLL) (KM, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 25, 2019 MDL Remark: ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-131) Finalized on 7/25/19. Please see pleading (4 in ILC/2:19-cv-02181, 1343 in MDL No. 2543). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the S.D. New York for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/25/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2543, ILC/2:19-cv-02181 (TLL) (KM, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Richard F Burke, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burke, Richard) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 7/18/19. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order. (KM, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Warner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Continental Automotive Systems US Inc.(Merlin, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Melissa M Merlin on behalf of Continental Automotive Systems US Inc (Merlin, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jennifer Ann Warner on behalf of General Motors LLC (Warner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - Defendant General Motors LLC's Joinder and Consent to Removal by Defendant General Motors LLC. (Warner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc.. (Merlin, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit Court, Champaign County, case number 2019L 000068 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3145796), filed by Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court file, #2 Exhibit B - Fanning Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Notice to Clerk of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merlin, Melissa) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner et al v. General Motors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Automotive Systems US, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa M. Merlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors L.L.C.
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Conner
Represented By: Richard F Burke, Jr
Represented By: Kristofer Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Conner
Represented By: Richard F Burke, Jr
Represented By: Kristofer Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?