FaZe Clan Inc. v. Tenney
Plaintiff: FaZe Clan Inc.
Defendant: Turner Tenney
Case Number: 1:2019cv07200
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 72 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their undersigned counsel, that the above-captioned action--including all claims asserted by Plaintiff against Defendant, and all counterclaims asserted by Counter-Plaintiff against Counter-Defendant--is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/27/2020) (jwh)
August 26, 2020 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km)
August 26, 2020 Filing 71 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Caixeiro, Manny)
June 24, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 6/24/2020, ( Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . filed by FaZe Clan Inc., #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . filed by Turner Tenney. FaZe Clan's motions for summary judgment are granted in part and denied in part. Tenney's motions are denied in their entirety. The parties are directed to jointly call the Court by no later than Wednesday, June 24 to set a trial date. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/17/20) (yv)
April 22, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/3/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 22, 2020 Filing 68 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/3/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Franko, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 4/3/2020. (kgo)
April 2, 2020 MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: The dial-in for the oral argument scheduled for 4 PM on April 3 is as follows: USA Toll-Free Number: (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. (tro)
March 26, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 26, 2020 Filing 66 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc...(Caixeiro, Manny)
March 20, 2020 Filing 65 AFFIRMATION of Joshua D. Liston in Opposition re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Y. Ali Deposition Transcript, #2 Banks Deposition Transcript, #3 FaZe Clan Video, #4 Banks Tweet).(Liston, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 64 STIPULATION AND OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS, COUNTERCLAIMS AND DEFENSES: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and 41(c) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and in an effort to streamline the issues requiring adjudication in this matter, Plaintiff-Counterdefendant FaZe Clan Inc. ("FaZe Clan") and Defendant-Counterplaintiff Turner Tenney p/k/a "Tfue" ("Tenney"), by and through their undersigned counsel of record, stipulate as follows: (I) The following causes of action in FaZe Clan's complaint are hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing its own costs. expenses, and attorneys' fees. Fifth Cause of Action (Misappropriation of Trade Secrets) Sixth cause of Action (Intentional Interference with Contract) to the extent it alleges interference with FaZe Clan's contracts with other gamers and media personalities; for purposes of clarity, FaZe Clan will continue to assert this Cause of Action to the extent it alleges interference with FaZe Clan's brand deals/sponsors; and Eighth Cause of Action (Commercial Disparagement). (2) The following defense and cause of action in Tenney's Answer and Counterclaims are hereby dismissed with prejudice., with each party bearing its own COST expenses, and attorneys' fees: Third Defense (Fraud); and Ninth cause of Action (Breech of Fiduciary Duty) The parties continue to assert. and do not waive, any and all causes of action and defenses other than those expressly dismissed herein. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/20/2020) (jwh)
March 20, 2020 Filing 63 COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT of Turner Tenney in Opposition re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 61 AFFIDAVIT of Melissa Bowden in Opposition re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 20, 2020 Filing 60 AFFIRMATION of Jesse Kaplan in Opposition re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 California State Court Ruling).(Liston, Joshua)
March 19, 2020 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 19, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response to Defendants Rule 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Richard Bengtson in Support of FaZe Clan Inc.s Opposition to Tenneys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Manny J. Caixeiro in Support of Opposition of Faze Clan Inc. to Tenneys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Lee Trink in Support of Opposition of Faze Clan Inc. to Tenneys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment).(Caixeiro, Manny)
March 17, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 3/17/2020. Telephone pretrial conference yesterday (3/17/20) in the above captioned case. 15 minutes. Judge Rakoff granted the parties' unopposed applications to file certain summary judgment documents in redacted form and/or under seal. (kgo)
March 9, 2020 Filing 57 LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Judd R. Spray dated 3/2/2020 re: Plaintiff FaZe Clan, Inc. respectfully requests an Order compelling CAA to produce all documents currently withheld as privileged. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc. (jwh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 56 EXHIBIT: 3rd Part Privilege Log: Defendant Turner Tennety pka "Tfue". Document filed by Turner Tenney. (jwh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 55 EXHIBIT: Privilege Log for Non-Party Creative Artists Agency, LLC.(jwh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Jerry D. Bernstein dated 3/4/2020 re: We represent non-party Creative Artists Agency, LLC ("CAA"), recipient of a subpoena in this action. Pursuant to the Court's March 3, 2020 order, we write in response to Plaintiffs counsel's March 2, 2020 letter to the Court. (jwh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Bryan J. Freedman dated 3/4/2020 re: Tenney respectfully requests that the Cou11 deny FaZe application to release documents identified on the privilege log (other than those identified in the first paragraph of this letter). Document filed by Turner Tenney. (jwh)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MEMORANDUM ORDER: CAA is accordingly ordered to produce the documents on the Tenney log by no later than March 11, 2020. In light of this production, the Court will allow an additional telephonic deposition of the CAA witness, not to exceed two hours in length, by no later than March 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/6/2020) (ks) (Main Document 52 replaced on 3/10/2020) (ks).
March 6, 2020 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Turner Tenney in Support re: #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Gamer Agreement, #2 Non-Renewal Letter, #3 Untimely Payments 1-5, #4 Untimely Payment 6, #5 RFAs, #6 FaZe Tweet re Cloak).(Liston, Joshua)
March 6, 2020 Filing 50 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 6, 2020 Filing 49 AFFIRMATION of Joshua D. Liston in Support re: #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Trink Deposition Transcript re Trade Secrets, #2 Trink Deposition Transcript re Cloak, #3 Brand Deals).(Liston, Joshua)
March 6, 2020 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
March 5, 2020 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . . Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Y. Ali, #3 Affidavit Declaration of E. Anderson, #4 Affidavit Declaration of M.J. Caixeiro, #5 Affidavit Declaration of W. Wiggin).(Caixeiro, Manny)
March 5, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. Responses due by 3/19/2020 Return Date set for 4/3/2020 at 04:00 PM..(Caixeiro, Manny)
March 5, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
February 18, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/18/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #42 Motion for Donald V. Smiley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2020) (mro)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/14/2020) (mro)
February 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for DONALD V. SMILEY, JR. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18798502. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 13, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for DONALD V. SMILEY, JR. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18798502. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Clements, Katherine)
February 12, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/12/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Agreement to Condition for New Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc...(Caixeiro, Manny)
February 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2020, ( Motions due by 3/5/2020., Replies due by 3/26/2020., Responses due by 3/19/2020). The oral argument, previously scheduled for March 12, 2020 is adjourned to April 3, 2020 at 4:00pm (Kotowski, Linda)
February 7, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
February 7, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Agreement to Condition for New Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Turner Tenney..(Liston, Joshua)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #38 Motion for Erika Lauren Georgiou to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/5/2020) (jwh)
February 4, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #38 MOTION for Erika Lauren Georgiou to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18673369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
February 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Erika Lauren Georgiou to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18673369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Clements, Katherine)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REQUIRING THIRD PARTY RICHARD TENNEY TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION: FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, third party Richard Tenney is ordered to appear for deposition, individually and as a representative of Turner Tenney LLC, on February 3, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. EST at the following location: 100 Ashley Drive South, Suite 600, Tampa, Florida 33602. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/29/2020) (jwh)
January 31, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/31/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/29/2020) (ks)
January 28, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/28/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TURNER TENNEY TO APPEAR AT DEPOSITION: FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, defendant Turner Tenney p/k/a "Tfue" is ordered to appear for his deposition on January 23rd, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. EST at the following location: Dentons US LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, 25th Floor, New York, NY 10020-1089. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 1/21/2020) (jwh)
January 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 1/21/2020. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. (Kotowski, Linda)
January 2, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judd Robert Spray on behalf of FaZe Clan Inc.. (Spray, Judd)
December 27, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #32 Counterclaim. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc..(Caixeiro, Manny)
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against FaZe Clan Inc.. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition to Determine Controversy, #2 Exhibit Notice of Ruling)(Liston, Joshua)
December 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #30 MOTION for Bryan J. Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18198068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT STATE OF CALIFORNIA;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Bryan J. Freedman for Turner Tenney admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/5/2019) (jwh)
December 4, 2019 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bryan J. Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18198068. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Liston, Joshua) Modified on 12/6/2019 (vba).
November 21, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Turner Tenney.(Liston, Joshua)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #25 Motion for Katherine Ramlose McMorrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/7/2019) (rro)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 OPINION AND ORDER re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action: The Court has also considered the defendant's other arguments and finds them unpersuasive. The defendant's motion is therefore denied. The plaintiff's proposed case management plan is adopted, and the parties are directed to appear at a final pre-trial conference, at which the Court will hear oral argument on any post-discovery summary judgment motions, on March 4, 2020 at 4 PM. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/31/2019) (jwh) Modified on 11/7/2019 (jwh).
November 6, 2019 Filing 26 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Ready for Trial by 2/28/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2019. Deposition due by 1/23/2020. Discovery due by 1/23/2020. Motions due by 1/30/2020. Responses due by 2/13/2020 Replies due by 2/20/2020. Oral Argument set for 3/4/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Ready for Trial by 2/28/2020. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/31/2019) (jwh)
November 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Katherine Ramlose McMorrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17895589. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Katherine Ramlose McMorrow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17895589. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McMorrow, Katherine)
October 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/29/2019, Oral Argument held on 10/29/2019 re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action. filed by Turner Tenney. (Kotowski, Linda)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jesse Kaplan in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action.. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Liston, Joshua)
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action. . Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Liston, Joshua)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Donald V. Smiley in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action.. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny)
October 17, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Manny J. Caixeiro in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action.. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action. . Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny)
October 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 10/10/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIRMATION of Joshua D. Liston in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action.. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Liston, Joshua)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action. . Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Liston, Joshua)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or Stay the Action. Document filed by Turner Tenney. Responses due by 10/22/2019(Liston, Joshua)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #11 Motion for Katherine A. Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/4/2019) (jwh)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for Joel D. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/4/2019) (jwh)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #10 Motion for Paul M. Kakuske to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/4/2019) (jwh)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/2/2019) (cf)
October 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Joel D. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17689613. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #11 MOTION for Katherine A. Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17689578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Joel D. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17689613. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Siegel, Joel)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Katherine A. Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17689578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Clements, Katherine)
September 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Paul M. Kakuske to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17686489. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Paul M. Kakuske to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17686489. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kakuske, Paul)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Turner Tenney. (Liston, Joshua)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Donovan Liston on behalf of Turner Tenney. (Liston, Joshua)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Turner Tenney served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. Service was accepted by Turner Tenney. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manny Joseph Caixeiro on behalf of FaZe Clan Inc.. (Caixeiro, Manny)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Turner Tenney. (jgo)
August 2, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
August 2, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
August 2, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
August 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Justin Nessim Kattan. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code d (Defendant);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff);. (jgo)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc..(Kattan, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kattan, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Turner Tenney p/k/a TFue, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc.. (Kattan, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Turner Tenney. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17356118)Document filed by FaZe Clan Inc..(Kattan, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FaZe Clan Inc. v. Tenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turner Tenney
Represented By: Joshua Donovan Liston
Represented By: Bryan J. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FaZe Clan Inc.
Represented By: Justin Nessim Kattan
Represented By: Manny Joseph Caixeiro
Represented By: Paul Kakuske
Represented By: Katherine Clements
Represented By: Joel Siegel
Represented By: Katherine Ramlose McMorrow
Represented By: Judd Robert Spray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?