Boulais v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Boulais
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca PLC, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co. and AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv07230
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katharine H Parker
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Tracy Boulais, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2019) (rj)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING MDL: WHEREAS, the parties consented to Judge Parker's jurisdiction in Boulais (19-cv-7230) and Margadonna (19-cv-6470). It is hereby ORDERED that this MDL is now closed. Any new case filed in this MDL using a short form complaint pursuant to Order No. 14 (see Doc. 81) after entry of this order will be rejected with a full refund of the filing fee. It is further ORDERED that any cases remaining in the MDL after closure shall proceed as a separate action outside this MDL. It is further ORDERED that, if the parties seek to add or modify any terms in this closure order, they may do so within 30 days of this Order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent to Reference to Magistrate Judge Parker. Document filed by AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Heins, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER NO 53: ORDERED that, by September 17, 2019, the parties shall file executed forms consenting to Judge Parkers jurisdiction for all purposes in Boulais v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, et al., No. 19 Civ. 7230, and Margadonna v. AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP, et al., No. 19 Civ. 6470. It is further ORDERED that, as discussed at the conference, counsel in Robertson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., 17 Civ. 8591, shall obtain the lien certification, required in the parties' settlement agreement, as soon as possible. An order closing Robertson, with the option for parties to reopen the case within 30 days, will follow separately. The parties may request to extend the time to reopen Robertson if needed. The order administratively closing the MDL and remanding the non-settled case(s) will follow after the parties have consented to Judge Parker's jurisdiction in Boulais and Margadonna. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(ama)
September 10, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(jcs)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER NO. 52: It is hereby ORDERED that, in addition to lead counsel, counsel for parties in Robertson v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., 17 Civ. 859, shall attend. The Robertson parties have violated successive extensions for filing their stipulation of dismissal, as Orders Nos. 45, 47, 48 and 49 require. Most recently, counsel missed the August 29, 2019, deadline in Order No. 49 (Dkt. No. 340). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/9/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER NO. 51: WHEREAS, the parties jointly requested, by e-mail to the Chambers inbox on July 22, 2019, a telephone conference to discuss two recently filed cases in the MDL. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a telephone conference on September 10, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. ET, to discuss these issues. The parties shall jointly call the Courtroom from a landline at 212-805-0288 and ensure that they have a good connection. (Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/23/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02776-LGS et al.(cf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-09444-LGS. Document filed by Tracy Boulais.(Burke, Daniel)
August 6, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:17-md-02776-LGS. (sjo)
August 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 6, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-md-02776-LGS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel C. Burke. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Daniel C. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; the related case number is incorrect on the docket entry and PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
August 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 1:17md2776. (sj)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS - PDF ERROR STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-06470. Document filed by Tracy Boulais.(Burke, Daniel) Modified on 8/5/2019 (sj).
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Daniel)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AstraZeneca AB, AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca PLC, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17360121)Document filed by Tracy Boulais.(Burke, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulais v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca AB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Boulais
Represented By: Daniel C. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?