Thetford v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: PAMELA L. THETFORD
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer US, Inc and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07237
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglass A. Kreis on behalf of Pamela L. Thetford. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC, 1:19-cv-07237-PAC(Kreis, Douglass)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) (dgo)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting (144) Motion for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:18-md-02859-PAC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC, 1:19-cv-07237-PAC (dgo)
September 11, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 AMENDED MOTION for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pamela L. Thetford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC, 1:19-cv-07237-PAC(Kreis, Douglass)
August 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17458878. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida. We do not except them from a state bar association.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Douglass Alan Kreis to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-17458878. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pamela L. Thetford. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC, 1:19-cv-07237-PAC(Kreis, Douglass) Modified on 8/20/2019 (bcu).
August 13, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
August 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
August 13, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
August 5, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Crotty as possibly related to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
August 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Douglass A. Kreis. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PAMELA L. THETFORD. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (dnh)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION re: that this action be filed as related to 1:18-MD-2859. Document filed by PAMELA L. THETFORD.(Kreis, Douglass)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kreis, Douglass)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc, Zimmer US, Inc, Zimmer, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17362525)Document filed by PAMELA L. THETFORD.(Kreis, Douglass)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thetford v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAMELA L. THETFORD
Represented By: Douglass A. Kreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer US, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?